Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/12/2016 at 08:16:12 (UTC).

FIRESIDE VS JACINTO

Case Summary

On 02/02/2006 FIRESIDE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JACINTO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0469

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FIRESIDE BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATIO

FIRESIDE BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

GRACE LIZA JACINTO

Assignee

CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignee Attorneys

PRENOVOST, NORMANDIN, BERGH & DAWE

WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

WINN LAW GROUP, APC

Defendant Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORAT

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 05/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 05/23/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11934922 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11759107.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11934922 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11759107.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 3/11/16) RECEIVED ON 03/11/2016.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 3/11/16) RECEIVED ON 03/11/2016.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/11/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/11/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/11/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/11/2016

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 11/01/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 11/01/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; FIRESIDE BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 05/06/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; FIRESIDE BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 05/06/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11359514 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11183406.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11359514 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11183406.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 04/10/2013.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 04/10/2013.

DECLARATION - OTHER (ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF NEW ATTORNEY OF RECORD) FILED BY CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 10/25/2012

DECLARATION - OTHER (ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF NEW ATTORNEY OF RECORD) FILED BY CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 10/25/2012

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 10/25/2012

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 10/25/2012

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 05/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4551687 RECEIVED ON 05/23/2016 04:33:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11934922 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11759107.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 3/11/16) RECEIVED ON 03/11/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4516075 RECEIVED ON 03/11/2016 08:56:32 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 11/01/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; FIRESIDE BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 05/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2006
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED ON 05/11/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 03/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 03/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 03/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 03/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 02/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 02/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRESIDE BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where CAVALRY INVESTMENTS is a litigant