This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/15/2016 at 09:28:24 (UTC).

F & M MAFCO INC VS AES HUNTINGTON BEACH

Case Summary

On 08/14/2002 F M MAFCO INC filed an Other lawsuit against AES HUNTINGTON BEACH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3317

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2002

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

F & M MAFCO INC

Defendant

AES HUNTINGTON BEACH LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE CASTRO WEST & CHODOROW INC

Defendant Attorney

BINGHAM MC CUTCHEN LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (DISMISSAL ORDERED - ENTIRE ACTION) ON 11/05/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 10/11/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (OFF CALENDAR - MISC) ON 09/06/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • DOCUMENT - OTHER (SPECIAL FILING SEE REMARKS) WAS FILED BY F & M MAFCO INC ON 08/08/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 02/14/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 02/06/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NTC OF REVIEW HEARING & NOTICE SENT) WAS FILED ON 01/05/2005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2004
  • DOCUMENT - OTHER (SPECIAL FILING SEE REMARKS) WAS FILED BY F & M MAFCO INC ON 04/19/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 04/12/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 04/12/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2003
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE BY MOVING PARTY) WAS FILED BY F & M MAFCO INC ON 05/08/2003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2003
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE BY COUNSEL OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) WAS FILED BY F & M MAFCO INC ON 05/07/2003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2003
  • NOTICE - OTHER (MASS NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT) WAS FILED ON 04/15/2003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2003
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARD ON 01/24/2003 AT 09:00:00 IN CJC AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 01/24/2003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2003
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) WAS FILED BY F & M MAFCO INC ON 01/09/2003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2002
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING) WAS FILED ON 11/01/2002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2002
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE - OTHER) WAS FILED BY F & M MAFCO INC ON 08/23/2002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2002
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY F & M MAFCO INC ON 08/14/2002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2002
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 08/14/2002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AES HUNTINGTON BEACH L.L.C. is a litigant