Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/03/2016 at 09:28:45 (UTC).

ERIN V CONTRERAS

Case Summary

On 12/27/2006 ERIN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CONTRERAS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5929

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT

Defendant

DONNA CONTRERAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

ELTMAN, ELTMAN & COOPER, PC

MICHAEL K. SIPES, ATTORNEY AT LAW

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 11/12/2014

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 11/12/2014

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 09/26/2014

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 09/26/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11504918 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11328703.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11504918 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11328703.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 11/22/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 11/22/2013

WRIT (ISSUED ON 12/03/2013) RECEIVED ON 11/22/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 12/03/2013) RECEIVED ON 11/22/2013.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 489374 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 489374 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11414130 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11238002.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11414130 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11238002.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 05/30/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 05/30/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11259562 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11083454.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11259562 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11083454.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 11/06/2012

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 11/06/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10975192 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10799084.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10975192 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10799084.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 08/17/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 08/17/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10929546 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10753438.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10929546 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10753438.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 05/31/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 05/31/2011

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 05/31/2011

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 05/31/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 04/06/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 04/06/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (RE:CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 04/06/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (RE:CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 04/06/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10197883 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10021758.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10197883 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10021758.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 12/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 11/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 09/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11504918 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11328703.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 11/22/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 12/03/2013) RECEIVED ON 11/22/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1127660 RECEIVED ON 11/22/2013 01:17:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 489374 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 02/22/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11414130 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11238002.

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 02/22/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 02/22/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 02/22/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 02/22/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 02/22/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2007
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 01/11/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 12/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 12/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ON 12/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Erin Capital Mgmt LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIPES, MICHAEL K