This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/28/2016 at 12:07:47 (UTC).

EQUITY V GUNDERSON

Case Summary

On 01/20/2006 EQUITY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GUNDERSON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0314

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEME

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

Defendants

CONOR WILLIAM GUNDERSON

CHRISTOPHER JAMES MARTINDALE

RONALD DAVID HIRST, II

NICHOLAS ANTHONY LEATHERWOOD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST JOHN, LLP

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN, LLP

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED (AS TO ORANGE COUNTY) FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION ON 05/15/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED (AS TO ORANGE COUNTY) FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION ON 05/15/2009

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION ON 03/20/2009

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION ON 03/20/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10231108 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10054983.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10231108 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10054983.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION ON 10/21/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION ON 10/21/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION ON 10/21/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION ON 10/21/2008

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED (AS TO ORANGE COUNTY) FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION ON 05/15/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION ON 03/20/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10231108 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10054983.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2008
  • WRIT ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY AGAINST DEFENDANTS CONOR WILLIAM GUNDERSON; RONALD DAVID HIRST II; NICHOLAS ANTHONY LEATHERWOOD; CHRISTOPHER JAMES MARTINDALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION ON 10/21/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION ON 10/21/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED ON 08/16/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION ON 07/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 05/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2006
  • COURT TRIAL HEARD ON 02/28/2006 AT 13:30:00 IN HLH AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 02/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 02/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION ON 02/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED) WAS FILED ON 01/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2006
  • NOTICE OF HEARING (NOTICE OF UD TRIAL/DISMISSAL HEARING) WAS FILED ON 01/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 01/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION ON 01/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 01/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less