This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/10/2016 at 11:34:20 (UTC).

EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT VS. GRAY

Case Summary

On 11/13/2001 EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GRAY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6928

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2001

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT

Defendant

HARRY GRAY

 

Court Documents

LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 04/24/2008

LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 04/24/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 04/24/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 04/24/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 07/29/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 07/29/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 04/22/2010

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 04/22/2010

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 01/18/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 01/18/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 03/07/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 03/07/2011

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 08/15/2011

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 08/15/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 08/15/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 08/15/2011

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 11/07/2011

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 11/07/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 11/07/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 11/07/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 06/27/2012

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 06/27/2012

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 03/04/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 03/04/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 12/03/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 12/03/2013

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 12/03/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 03/04/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2012
  • DocketTRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 06/27/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 11/07/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 11/07/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 08/15/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 08/15/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2011
  • DocketWRIT UPDATED ON 08/03/2009.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 01/18/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 04/22/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2009
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 07/29/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 04/24/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2008
  • DocketCOURT ENTERS JUDGMENT FOR STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 5429.12 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST GRAY, HARRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2008
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF EDD STATE JUDGMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT ON 04/24/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2008
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less