This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/13/2017 at 09:32:31 (UTC).

EDWIN CRAIG SHELDON VS. KATHLEEN STRONG

Case Summary

On 11/23/2010 EDWIN CRAIG SHELDON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KATHLEEN STRONG. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Appellants

BILL SUOJANEN

WILLIAM WAYNE SUOJANEN

EDWIN CRAIG SHELDON

WAYNE WILLIAM SUOJANEN

AMER JNEID

EMANAGELAW, INC.

ALI BEYDOUN

MICHAEL G YORK

KATHLEEN STRONG

WENDY REED

K DIANE STRONG

WENDY REED A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORP

FORD MOTOR CREDIT CO.

BLUE OCEAN PARTNERS, LLC

FORD MOTOR CREDIT CO.,

THE LAW FUNDER, LLC

THOMAS PISTONE

USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC

PISTONE & WOLDER, LLP

Cross Defendants, Claimants and Appellants

MICHAEL G YORK

ALI BEYDOUN

Cross Defendants, Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs, Respondent / Appellees and Appellants

WENDY REED

KATHLEEN STRONG

DUNLAP, DUNLAP & PECK

Cross Defendant, Assignee and Respondent / Appellee

USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC

Defendants, Cross Defendants, Not Classified By Court, Respondent / Appellees, Cross Plaintiffs and Appellants

KATHLEEN STRONG

USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff, Appellant and Claimant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL G. YORK

THE MAJORS LAW FIRM

THE SALL LAW FIRM

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff, Appellant, Claimant, Respondent / Appellee and Assignee Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL G. YORK

THE MAJORS LAW FIRM

DAVID EPSTEIN LAW FIRM-THE

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID J. HARTER

STRONG LAW FIRM

THE SALL LAW FIRM

LABOWE LABOWE & HOFFMAN LLP

PISTONE & WOLDER, LLP

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID J. HARTER, APC

Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff, Appellant, Defendant, Not Classified By Court, Respondent / Appellee and Assignee Attorneys

DAVID EPSTEIN LAW FIRM-THE

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID J. HARTER

STRONG LAW FIRM

PURDY & BREHME

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID J. HARTER, APC

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW A. KURZ

TREPEL LAW

DONGELL LAWRENCE FINNEY, LLP

MASCHOFF BRENNAN

 

Court Documents

REMITTITUR FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/16/2017

REMITTITUR FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/16/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC ON 05/17/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC ON 05/17/2017

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G054699

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G054699

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE TOUCH LEGAL FOR 24 - TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL IN THE AMOUNT OF 278.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12142209 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11965995.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE TOUCH LEGAL FOR 24 - TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL IN THE AMOUNT OF 278.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12142209 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11965995.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC ON 04/13/2017

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC ON 04/13/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL YORK FOR 24 - TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL IN THE AMOUNT OF 482.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12138529 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11962312.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL YORK FOR 24 - TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL IN THE AMOUNT OF 482.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12138529 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11962312.

NOTICE OF CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT FEES

NOTICE OF CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT FEES

ORDER G054699

ORDER G054699

DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (RESPONDENT) FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC ON 03/23/2017

DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (RESPONDENT) FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC ON 03/23/2017

DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY SHELDON, EDWIN CRAIG ON 03/14/2017

DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY SHELDON, EDWIN CRAIG ON 03/14/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY SHELDON, EDWIN CRAIG ON 03/14/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY SHELDON, EDWIN CRAIG ON 03/14/2017

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G054699

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G054699

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 24 - TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL, DISTRICT COURT APPEAL IN THE AMOUNT OF 875.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12117081 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11940904.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 24 - TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL, DISTRICT COURT APPEAL IN THE AMOUNT OF 875.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12117081 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11940904.

NOTICE OF APPEAL - UNLIMITED CIVIL FILED

NOTICE OF APPEAL - UNLIMITED CIVIL FILED

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY THE CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD ON 12/14/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY THE CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD ON 12/14/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2493045 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2493045 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC ON 09/13/2016

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC ON 09/13/2016

1,372 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC ON 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4725452 RECEIVED ON 05/17/2017 12:04:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G054699

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE TOUCH LEGAL FOR 24 - TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL IN THE AMOUNT OF 278.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12142209 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11965995.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC ON 04/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4708712 RECEIVED ON 04/13/2017 04:30:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL YORK FOR 24 - TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL IN THE AMOUNT OF 482.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12138529 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11962312.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DISBURSEMENT ON TRUST 328837 TO DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL ISSUED IN THE AMOUNT OF 775.00 DUE TO OTHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
2,282 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2010
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER C.C.P. 170.6 AS TO THE HONORABLE WILLIAM M. MONROE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO ROBERT MOSS EFFECTIVE 12/29/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 167 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10800112 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10624004.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP FILED BY STRONG, KATHLEEN ON 12/22/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2010
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 221598 RECEIVED ON 12/22/2010 03:29:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 166 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10778174 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10602066.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MONROE, WILLIAM ON 11/23/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SHELDON, EDWIN CRAIG; BEYDOUN, ALI; JNEID, AMER; SUOJANEN, BILL ON 11/23/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SHELDON, EDWIN CRAIG; BEYDOUN, ALI; JNEID, AMER; SUOJANEN, BILL ON 11/23/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SHELDON, EDWIN CRAIG; BEYDOUN, ALI; JNEID, AMER; SUOJANEN, BILL ON 11/23/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Blue Ocean Partners, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant