This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/16/2016 at 05:06:02 (UTC).

DOE VS. CORPORATION OF THE PRESIDING BISHOP OF THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS

Case Summary

On 04/10/2008 DOE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CORPORATION OF THE PRESIDING BISHOP OF THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

JOHN AJ DOE

Defendants and Respondents

DOE 7

DOE 8

TCS VIDEO

DOE 1

NEWPORT BEACH STAKE

DOE 6

CORPORATION OF THE PRESIDING BISHOP OF

PAMELA SUMMERS

TODD C. SUMMERS

DOE 3

DOE 4

CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY S

DOE 2

DOE 5

ROGER SUMMERS

BIRCHDALE PROPERTIES, INC.

NEWPORT BEACH SECOND WARD

DOE 9

CORPORATION OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE CH

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

O'DONNELL & CLARK, LLP

MANLY & STEWART

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF STEVEN R. YOUNG

GATES, O'DOHERTY, GONTHER, & GUY

MICHAEL MAGUIRE & ASSOCIATES

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN R YOUNG

LATHAM & WATKINS LLP

STEVEN R YOUNG

GREEN & HALL, APC

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 08/24/2009 03:34:23 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 08/24/2009 03:34:23 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 2009-07-09 13:30:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 2009-07-09 13:30:00.0.

OPPOSITION (TO ROGER SUMMERS & PAMELA SUMMERS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS) FILED BY DOE, JOHN AJ ON 06/29/2009

OPPOSITION (TO ROGER SUMMERS & PAMELA SUMMERS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS) FILED BY DOE, JOHN AJ ON 06/29/2009

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DOE 7 ON 03/04/2009

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DOE 7 ON 03/04/2009

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF ROBERT D. CROCKETT) FILED BY CORPORATION OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS ON 02/17/2009

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF ROBERT D. CROCKETT) FILED BY CORPORATION OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS ON 02/17/2009

REPLY - OTHER (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TERMINATE) FILED BY CORPORATION OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS ON 02/18/2009

REPLY - OTHER (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TERMINATE) FILED BY CORPORATION OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS ON 02/18/2009

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 01/27/2009 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 01/27/2009 02:00:00 PM.

DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION OF JOEL DEHLIN) FILED BY DOE 1; DOE 2; DOE 3; DOE 4 ON 11/17/2008

DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION OF JOEL DEHLIN) FILED BY DOE 1; DOE 2; DOE 3; DOE 4 ON 11/17/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10242251 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10066126.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10242251 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10066126.

WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF RULING

WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF RULING

OBJECTION (TO DECLARATION OF MR. FINALDI) FILED BY DOE 9 ON 10/10/2008

OBJECTION (TO DECLARATION OF MR. FINALDI) FILED BY DOE 9 ON 10/10/2008

DECLARATION - OTHER (IN SUPPORT OF REPLY) FILED BY DOE 9 ON 10/10/2008

DECLARATION - OTHER (IN SUPPORT OF REPLY) FILED BY DOE 9 ON 10/10/2008

MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT FILED BY DOE 9 ON 10/09/2008

MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT FILED BY DOE 9 ON 10/09/2008

SEPARATE STATEMENT (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FROM DOES 1-4 FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES SET ONE & SANCTIONS) FILED BY DOE, JOHN AJ ON 10/03/2008

SEPARATE STATEMENT (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FROM DOES 1-4 FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES SET ONE & SANCTIONS) FILED BY DOE, JOHN AJ ON 10/03/2008

NOTICE OF LODGING (IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL EXTENDED DEPOSITON) FILED BY DOE, JOHN AJ ON 08/25/2008

NOTICE OF LODGING (IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL EXTENDED DEPOSITON) FILED BY DOE, JOHN AJ ON 08/25/2008

REPLY - OTHER (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY DOE 1 ON 08/18/2008

REPLY - OTHER (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY DOE 1 ON 08/18/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10114317 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 138683.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10114317 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 138683.

399 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2009
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (COMPLAINT AS TO SOLE REMAINING DEFENDANT TODD SUMMERS) FILED BY DOE, JOHN AJ ON 04/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (OF TAKING MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER OFF CALENDAR) FILED BY SUMMERS, TODD C.; TCS VIDEO ON 04/14/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10437682.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER) FILED BY SUMMERS, TODD C.; TCS VIDEO ON 04/08/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (OF JIM P. MAHACEK IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER) FILED BY SUMMERS, TODD C.; TCS VIDEO ON 04/08/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND SCHEDULED FOR 05/10/2010 AT 10:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND (ANSWER TO ALLEGE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT & TO DISMISS ACTION) FILED BY SUMMERS, TODD C.; TCS VIDEO ON 04/08/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (FORMER ATTORNEY THOMAS ROLL - NEW ATTORNEY LAW OFFICE OF STEVE YOUNG - J. MAHACEK) FILED BY TCS VIDEO ON 04/08/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR G042571

    Read MoreRead Less
520 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/18/2008 03:57:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2008
  • THE MATTER IS REASSIGNED FROM DEPARTMENT CX105 TO DEPARTMENT CX103.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2008
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER C.C.P. 170.6 AS TO THE HONORABLE STEPHEN J. SUNDVOLD FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2008
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO RONALD BAUER EFFECTIVE 04/18/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP FILED BY DOE, JOHN AJ ON 04/18/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10092243 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 116610.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SUNDVOLD, STEPHEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DOE, JOHN AJ ON 04/10/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY DOE, JOHN AJ ON 04/10/2008

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.