This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/16/2016 at 08:19:11 (UTC).

DISCOVER VS HENNING

Case Summary

On 07/18/2005 DISCOVER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HENNING. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3649

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

FREDERICK L HENNING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MANN BRACKEN, LLP

WINN LAW GROUP

WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/01/2010

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/01/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 10/22/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 10/22/2015

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 10/22/2015

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 10/22/2015

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 10/22/15) RECEIVED ON 10/22/2015.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 10/22/15) RECEIVED ON 10/22/2015.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11866201 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11690385.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11866201 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11690385.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/20/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/20/2015

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/20/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3354009 RECEIVED ON 11/20/2015 09:10:40 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11866201 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11690385.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 10/22/15) RECEIVED ON 10/22/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 10/22/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 10/22/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4453471 RECEIVED ON 10/22/2015 12:56:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/01/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2007
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED (WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED) WAS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 06/21/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2006
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST (MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMNT,ACK. OF CREDIT,DECL OF ACCRUED INTEREST) WAS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 12/15/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2005
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 12/30/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2005
  • DocketABSTRACT ISSUED ON 12/30/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2005
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2005
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 10/28/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2005
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 10/11/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2005
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 10/11/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2005
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED TO SUMMONS) WAS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 08/22/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2005
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 07/18/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2005
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 07/18/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant