This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/28/2016 at 05:30:27 (UTC).

DISCOVER VS BARRERA

Case Summary

On 01/12/2006 DISCOVER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BARRERA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0125

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendants

JAVIER BARRERA

SILVIA BARRERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BIDNA AND KEYS

THE MOORE LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11968194 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11792350.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11968194 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11792350.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 5-17-16) RECEIVED ON 05/12/2016.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 5-17-16) RECEIVED ON 05/12/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/14/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/14/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11934900 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11759085.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11934900 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11759085.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/11/2016

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/11/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/11/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/11/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/11/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/11/2016

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 3/11/16) RECEIVED ON 03/11/2016.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 3/11/16) RECEIVED ON 03/11/2016.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11968194 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11792350.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 5-17-16) RECEIVED ON 05/12/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4546825 RECEIVED ON 05/12/2016 03:28:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3390639 RECEIVED ON 03/14/2016 08:25:36 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11934900 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11759085.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 3/11/16) RECEIVED ON 03/11/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED ON 03/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED ON 03/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED ON 03/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED ON 03/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 01/31/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 01/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 01/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 01/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 01/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 01/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.