This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 09:06:42 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS QUEJA

Case Summary

On 08/20/2001 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against QUEJA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4931

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2001

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

JAMES N QUEJA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Other Attorneys

MANN BRACKEN LLP

 

Court Documents

LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/27/2008

LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/27/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/27/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/27/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10064781 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 89166.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10064781 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 89166.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 04/14/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 04/14/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10098733 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 123100.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10098733 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 123100.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 09/04/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 09/04/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (NAME CHANGE OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL OF RECORD) FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 09/18/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (NAME CHANGE OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL OF RECORD) FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 09/18/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 09/18/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 09/18/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10208435 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10032310.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10208435 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10032310.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/10/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/10/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 04/08/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 04/08/2009

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/24/2010

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/24/2010

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2012
  • DocketTRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/24/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • DocketWRIT UPDATED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 04/08/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/10/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10208435 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10032310.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 09/18/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (NAME CHANGE OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL OF RECORD) FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 09/18/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 09/04/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10098733 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 123100.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2008
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION-LOS ANGELES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 04/14/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10064781 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 89166.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2008
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION-ORANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/27/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2001
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2001
  • DocketCOURT ENTERS JUDGMENT FOR DISCOVER BANK IN THE AMOUNT OF 7109.56 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST QUEJA, JAMES N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/27/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2008
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant