This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/27/2016 at 11:57:10 (UTC).

DEGENHARDT VS REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 01/06/2006 DEGENHARDT filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1917

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLISON DEGENHARDT

STEPHANIE VU

DENNIS BRIDWELL

ROBERT BRIDWELL

RICK NGO

MELISSA PAIGE

LONNIE AMBRIZ

LAURA AMBRIZ AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

SHERRI HENDERSON

KEN HENDERSON

JOSHUA HAMBARIAN

JILL HAMBARIAN

KORY JAMES

JENNIFER DEGENHARDT

MARK DANN

ED BELL

SUSAN GROTH

NICHOLAS HAMBARIAN

LORRAINE AMBRIZ

ELODIE IRVINE

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GREENE BROILLET & WHEELER LLP

TAYLOR & RING LLP

CALLAHAN, THOMPSON, SHERMAN & CAUDILL, LLP

Other Attorneys

LA FOLLETTE, JOHNSON, DE HAAS, FESLER & AMES

BONNE BRIDGES MUELLER O'KEEFE & NICHOLS

CALLAHAN MC CUNE & WILLIS

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID J. WEISS

 

Court Documents

SEPARATE STATEMENT (IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) FILED BY KYLANDER, TREVOR; KYLANDER, TORRY ON 06/14/2011

SEPARATE STATEMENT (IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) FILED BY KYLANDER, TREVOR; KYLANDER, TORRY ON 06/14/2011

OPPOSITION FILED BY CYGAN, RALPH W. ON 08/27/2010

OPPOSITION FILED BY CYGAN, RALPH W. ON 08/27/2010

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 07/21/2010 04:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 07/21/2010 04:00:00 PM.

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY DEGENHARDT, AUDREY ON 07/15/2010

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY DEGENHARDT, AUDREY ON 07/15/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10491397.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10491397.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY AMBRIZ, LAURA ON 12/21/2009

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY AMBRIZ, LAURA ON 12/21/2009

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HART, MARQUIS ON 11/06/2009

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HART, MARQUIS ON 11/06/2009

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY AMBRIZ, LORRAINE ON 10/01/2009

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY AMBRIZ, LORRAINE ON 10/01/2009

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2009-07-10 13:06:36.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2009-07-10 13:06:36.0.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HART, MARQUIS ON 06/17/2009

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HART, MARQUIS ON 06/17/2009

MOTION - OTHER (TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S DISCOVERY ORDER) FILED BY DEGENHARDT, AUDREY; DEGENHARDT, JENNIFER; DEGNHARDT, AURDREY ON 04/13/2009

MOTION - OTHER (TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S DISCOVERY ORDER) FILED BY DEGENHARDT, AUDREY; DEGENHARDT, JENNIFER; DEGNHARDT, AURDREY ON 04/13/2009

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY DEGENHARDT, AUDREY ON 02/06/2009

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY DEGENHARDT, AUDREY ON 02/06/2009

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2009-01-29 14:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2009-01-29 14:00:00.0.

SEPARATE STATEMENT (OF DISCOVERY ITEMS IN DISPUTE RE: MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO HENDERSON'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO) FILED BY DEGENHARDT, AUDREY ON 12/09/2008

SEPARATE STATEMENT (OF DISCOVERY ITEMS IN DISPUTE RE: MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO HENDERSON'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO) FILED BY DEGENHARDT, AUDREY ON 12/09/2008

MOTION TO COMPEL (FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. 2) FILED BY DEGENHARDT, AUDREY ON 12/05/2008

MOTION TO COMPEL (FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. 2) FILED BY DEGENHARDT, AUDREY ON 12/05/2008

DECLARATION OF DAVID K. IMAGAWA, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF HIS JOINDER.

DECLARATION OF DAVID K. IMAGAWA, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF HIS JOINDER.

OPPOSITION (JOINDER) FILED BY HART, MARQUIS; KHANNA, AJAI ON 09/10/2008

OPPOSITION (JOINDER) FILED BY HART, MARQUIS; KHANNA, AJAI ON 09/10/2008

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY DEGENHARDT, AUDREY ON 08/20/2008

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY DEGENHARDT, AUDREY ON 08/20/2008

561 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DEGNHARDT, AURDREY ON 10/13/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 265364 RECEIVED ON 10/13/2011 04:48:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER) FILED BY CYGAN, RALPH W. ON 09/27/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/26/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 261748 RECEIVED ON 09/26/2011 04:02:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/12/2011 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
928 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 05/04/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 04/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 03/15/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 02/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 02/08/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE - OTHER) WAS FILED BY AURDREY DEGNHARDT ON 01/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - OTHER) WAS FILED BY AURDREY DEGNHARDT ON 01/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY AURDREY DEGNHARDT ON 01/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY AURDREY DEGNHARDT ON 01/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 01/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.