This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 08:00:47 (UTC).

D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE V CHIQUETE

Case Summary

On 07/28/2004 D A N JOINT VENTURE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHIQUETE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3538

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P

Defendants

ANNA E CHIQUETE

JOE CHIQUETE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREWER & BREWER

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 09/17/2008

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 09/17/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND WRIT REJECTED

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND WRIT REJECTED

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 10/24/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 10/24/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10232379 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10056254.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10232379 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10056254.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED (AS TO ORANGE COUNTY) FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 05/15/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED (AS TO ORANGE COUNTY) FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 05/15/2009

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 09/10/2009

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 09/10/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 09/10/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 09/10/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10498261 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10322134.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10498261 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10322134.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 05/21/2010

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 05/21/2010

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P REJECTED ON 01/10/2011.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P REJECTED ON 01/10/2011.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P REJECTED ON 01/25/2011.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P REJECTED ON 01/25/2011.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P REJECTED ON 02/07/2011.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P REJECTED ON 02/07/2011.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 07/18/2011

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 07/18/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 26.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10954282 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10778174.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 26.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10954282 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10778174.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 26.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10954282 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10778174.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 07/18/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P REJECTED ON 02/07/2011.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P REJECTED ON 01/25/2011.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P REJECTED ON 01/10/2011.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 05/21/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10498261 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10322134.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2009
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 09/10/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2004
  • DocketABSTRACT ISSUED ON 11/16/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2004
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - LIMITED CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 10/28/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2004
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 10/27/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2004
  • DocketREQUEST - OTHER (REQUEST - OTHER) WAS FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 10/27/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2004
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 10/05/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2004
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE (CERTIFICATE OF DUE DILIGENCE) WAS FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 08/25/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2004
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 08/25/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2004
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED (SUMMONS RETURNED) WAS FILED BY D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L P ON 08/25/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2004
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 07/28/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAN JOINT VENTURE III LP is a litigant