This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/29/2016 at 06:21:51 (UTC).

CRUZ VS K HOVNANIAN FORECAST HOMES INC

Case Summary

On 11/02/2006 CRUZ filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against K HOVNANIAN FORECAST HOMES INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0223

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CECILIO PADILLA

ERNESTO CRUZ

JESUS RUBALCAVA

ROBERT VEGA

CAROLINE VEGA

ILEANA MEZA

MARIA CRUZ

IFTEKHAR MAHMUD

LAURA STEWART

Defendant

R & S MADRIGAL CONSTRUCTION & SUPPLY I

Cross Defendants

INTERSTATE SHEET METAL INC

RCR PLUMBING INC

SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC

CAMPBELL CONCRETE OF CALIFORNIA INC

GARY BOLAND

PATRIOT ENTERPRISES INC

WESTERN INSULATION INC

FIBER CARE BATHS INC

RANCHO PLASTERING INC

SC DESIGN INC

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT CLAUSEN

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

MARSHALL FRENCH & DEGRAVE

LETOFSKY MCCLAIN

FREDRICKSON MAZEIKA & GRANT LLP

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

MCMAHON LAW FIRM INC

KENNEDY & SOUZA APC

Other Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

GRAVES AND KING LLP

LAW OFFICE OF KEVIN PEGAN

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR

DRISCOLL & ASSOCIATES

ULICH & TERRY LLP

OSMAN & ASSOCIATES

KRUTCIK & GEORGGIN

LEE BAZZO & NISHI LLP

WAYNE THOMAS & ASSOCIATES

BONETATI KINCAID & KINCAID, INC

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 2009-02-25 08:30:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 2009-02-25 08:30:00.0.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY K HOVNANIAN FORECAST HOMES INC; FORECAST GROUP LP ON 02/10/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY K HOVNANIAN FORECAST HOMES INC; FORECAST GROUP LP ON 02/10/2009

NOTICE OF HEARING (RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT COMPLIANCE) FILED BY K HOVNANIAN FORECAST HOMES INC; FORECAST GROUP LP ON 01/28/2009

NOTICE OF HEARING (RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT COMPLIANCE) FILED BY K HOVNANIAN FORECAST HOMES INC; FORECAST GROUP LP ON 01/28/2009

CASE REASSIGNED TO STOCK,NANCY EFFECTIVE 01/05/2009.

CASE REASSIGNED TO STOCK,NANCY EFFECTIVE 01/05/2009.

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT COMPLIANCE) FILED BY K HOVNANIAN FORECAST HOMES INC; FORECAST GROUP LP ON 12/08/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT COMPLIANCE) FILED BY K HOVNANIAN FORECAST HOMES INC; FORECAST GROUP LP ON 12/08/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE (ON APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY CAMPBELL CONCRETE OF CALIFORNIA INC ON 06/19/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE (ON APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY CAMPBELL CONCRETE OF CALIFORNIA INC ON 06/19/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY CAMPBELL CONCRETE OF CALIFORNIA INC ON 06/19/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY CAMPBELL CONCRETE OF CALIFORNIA INC ON 06/19/2008

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CAMPBELL CONCRETE OF CALIFORNIA INC ON 06/19/2008

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CAMPBELL CONCRETE OF CALIFORNIA INC ON 06/19/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY BRENNAN ELECTRIC INC ON 05/19/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY BRENNAN ELECTRIC INC ON 05/19/2008

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY RCR PLUMBING INC ON 05/08/2008

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY RCR PLUMBING INC ON 05/08/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (ENTRY OF ORDER) FILED BY PATRIOT ENTERPRISES INC ON 05/06/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (ENTRY OF ORDER) FILED BY PATRIOT ENTERPRISES INC ON 05/06/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF CANCELLATION OF MSC) FILED BY CRUZ, ERNESTO; CRUZ, MARIA ON 04/16/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF CANCELLATION OF MSC) FILED BY CRUZ, ERNESTO; CRUZ, MARIA ON 04/16/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY BRENNAN ELECTRIC INC ON 03/25/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY BRENNAN ELECTRIC INC ON 03/25/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 2008-03-20 09:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 2008-03-20 09:00:00.0.

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY PATRIOT ENTERPRISES INC ON 03/18/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY PATRIOT ENTERPRISES INC ON 03/18/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10074236 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 98621.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10074236 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 98621.

OBJECTION (TO RECOMMENDATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC ON 02/21/2008

OBJECTION (TO RECOMMENDATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC ON 02/21/2008

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PATRIOT ENTERPRISES INC ON 02/20/2008

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PATRIOT ENTERPRISES INC ON 02/20/2008

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2009
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 2009-02-25 08:30:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY JENSTAR ENTERPRISES INC ON 02/24/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY K HOVNANIAN FORECAST HOMES INC ON 02/11/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (AS TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY CRUZ, ERNESTO; CRUZ, MARIA ON 02/10/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY K HOVNANIAN FORECAST HOMES INC; FORECAST GROUP LP ON 02/10/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING (RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT COMPLIANCE) FILED BY K HOVNANIAN FORECAST HOMES INC; FORECAST GROUP LP ON 01/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT 2009-01-22 08:30:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 02/25/2009 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX105 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING (RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT COMPLIANCE) FILED BY K HOVNANIAN FORECAST HOMES INC; FORECAST GROUP LP ON 12/23/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
134 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 03/06/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2007
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT/PETITION) WAS FILED BY K HOVNANIAN FORECAST HOMES INC ON 03/02/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2007
  • STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT (STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT/REPORT) WAS FILED BY ERNESTO CRUZ ON 02/21/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE - OTHER) WAS FILED BY ERNESTO CRUZ ON 02/21/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY ERNESTO CRUZ ON 11/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 11/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 11/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY ERNESTO CRUZ ON 11/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY ERNESTO CRUZ ON 11/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 11/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.