This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/18/2016 at 03:00:52 (UTC).

CREDIGY RECEIVABLES VS CHINEA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2005 CREDIGY RECEIVABLES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHINEA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5482

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIGY RECEIVABLES

Defendant

JEAN ELLEN CHINEA

Assignee

EGC FINANCIAL, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant and Assignee Attorneys

MANN BRACKEN, LLP

LAW OFFICES OF KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EGC FINANCIAL, LLC ON 06/17/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EGC FINANCIAL, LLC ON 06/17/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EGC FINANCIAL, LLC ON 06/17/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EGC FINANCIAL, LLC ON 06/17/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11386013 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11209905.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11386013 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11209905.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES ON 05/29/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES ON 05/29/2013

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 06/05/13) RECEIVED ON 05/29/2013.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 06/05/13) RECEIVED ON 05/29/2013.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES ON 05/29/2013

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES ON 05/29/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11210005 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11033897.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11210005 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11033897.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES ON 01/19/2012

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES ON 01/19/2012

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES ON 01/19/2012

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES ON 01/19/2012

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EGC FINANCIAL, LLC ON 06/17/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EGC FINANCIAL, LLC ON 06/17/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2255080 RECEIVED ON 06/17/2013 12:49:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11386013 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11209905.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES ON 05/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 06/05/13) RECEIVED ON 05/29/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES ON 05/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 323154 RECEIVED ON 05/29/2013 09:38:58 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2012
  • TRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11210005 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11033897.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2006
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED ON 01/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2005
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2005
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES ON 12/05/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2005
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES ON 12/05/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2005
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/O PREJUDICE) WAS FILED ON 12/05/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2005
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES ON 12/05/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED TO SUMMONS) WAS FILED ON 11/01/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED ON 10/31/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2005
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES ON 10/04/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2005
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/04/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EGC FINANCIAL LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant