This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/29/2016 at 06:22:12 (UTC).

CRAYTON VS KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC

Case Summary

On 11/02/2006 CRAYTON filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0225

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROY MOSLEY

JACK GODINHO

DOLLY MEDLOCK

LOREN THOMAS

THANA WOOT OONSIRI

BLANCA ORTIZ

PEDRO VALDEZ

PATRICE MONTGOMERY

LETICIA GARCIA

JOSHUA MENSAH

MERCY MENSAH

BRUCE MONTGOMERY

ESTHER VALDEZ

NUBITI KAMI

LISAMARIE SHELTON

JULIE GODINHO

YIQUIN FENG

JOSE GARCIA

LUIS GONZALES

LAILA KABIR

63 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT CLAUSEN

Other Attorneys

BOHL NIXON & SCHONEMAN

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

SILVER, CRAIG J: LAW OFFICES OF

MARSHALL FRENCH & DEGRAVE

LONG, WILLIAMSON & DELIS

CALLAHAN MC CUNE & WILLIS

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA, LLP

PIVO, HALBREICH, MARTIN, WILSON & AMO, LLP

HINES SMITH CARDER DINCEL BLAND

LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. BUREK

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP

FREDRICKSON MAZEIKA & GRANT LLP

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL

GRAY * DUFFY, LLP

ANDREWS & RHODES LLP

LAW OFFICE OF KEVIN PEGAN

LAW OFFICES OF STACY FIERMAN-CRIBBS

LORBER GREENFIELD & POLITO LLP

MULLEN & BADAME LLP

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - OTHER (TO APPEAR VIA COURTCALL) FILED BY KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC ON 08/03/2010

NOTICE - OTHER (TO APPEAR VIA COURTCALL) FILED BY KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC ON 08/03/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (RE STIPULATION & ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT) FILED BY DAN CARDONA ON 07/22/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (RE STIPULATION & ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT) FILED BY DAN CARDONA ON 07/22/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER, 134- ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 375.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10505394.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER, 134- ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 375.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10505394.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/13/2010.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/13/2010.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY LASCO BATHWARE INC ON 04/30/2010

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY LASCO BATHWARE INC ON 04/30/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC ON 03/23/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC ON 03/23/2010

NOTICE - OTHER (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) FILED BY KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC; KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC ON 02/11/2010

NOTICE - OTHER (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) FILED BY KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC; KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC ON 02/11/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC ON 01/22/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC ON 01/22/2010

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC ON 01/22/2010

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC ON 01/22/2010

NOTICE - OTHER (OF STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC ON 01/21/2010

NOTICE - OTHER (OF STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC ON 01/21/2010

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY LA LANDSCAPE INC ON 10/01/2009

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY LA LANDSCAPE INC ON 10/01/2009

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MGM CONSTRUCTION CO. ON 07/01/2009

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MGM CONSTRUCTION CO. ON 07/01/2009

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY ANDRE LANDSCAPE SERVICE INC ON 12/30/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY ANDRE LANDSCAPE SERVICE INC ON 12/30/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY COASTAL CONCEPTS ON 07/17/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY COASTAL CONCEPTS ON 07/17/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10103375 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 127742.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10103375 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 127742.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT 02/28/2008 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT 02/28/2008 01:30:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10049512 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 73919.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10049512 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 73919.

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF ALLISON S GIRVIN ESQ.) FILED BY SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC ON 02/01/2008

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF ALLISON S GIRVIN ESQ.) FILED BY SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC ON 02/01/2008

354 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2011
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 05/06/2011 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
599 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2006
  • AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC ON 12/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC ON 12/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2006
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT (CROSS-COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC ON 12/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2006
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT/PETITION) WAS FILED BY KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC ON 12/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY ROBIN CRAYTON ON 11/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 11/15/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 11/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY ROBIN CRAYTON ON 11/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY ROBIN CRAYTON ON 11/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 11/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.