This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/03/2016 at 08:56:52 (UTC).

COOKSEY VS POST MODERN GROUP

Case Summary

On 06/28/2007 COOKSEY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against POST MODERN GROUP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7414

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ALAN D COOKSEY

I'M PERFECT, LLC

LEONARD ROOS

I'M PERFECT LLC

JACK O'HALLORAN

JAMES O'HALLORAN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

POST MODERN EDIT LLC

POST MODERN GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF SIMONE & ROOS

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

REED SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (COMPLAINT) FILED BY COOKSEY, ALAN D ON 10/22/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (COMPLAINT) FILED BY COOKSEY, ALAN D ON 10/22/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 3.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10227797 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10051672.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 3.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10227797 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10051672.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 3.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10212607 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10036482.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 3.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10212607 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10036482.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY POST MODERN EDIT LLC ON 09/29/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY POST MODERN EDIT LLC ON 09/29/2008

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY POST MODERN EDIT LLC ON 09/29/2008

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY POST MODERN EDIT LLC ON 09/29/2008

EXHIBITS RECEIVED IN EVIDENCE - JOINT

EXHIBITS RECEIVED IN EVIDENCE - JOINT

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR RETURN OF EXHIBITS.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR RETURN OF EXHIBITS.

JUDGMENT FILED BY POST MODERN EDIT LLC ON 09/15/2008

JUDGMENT FILED BY POST MODERN EDIT LLC ON 09/15/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/17/2008 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/17/2008 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 22 - COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES - FULL DAY IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10203439 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10027314.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 22 - COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES - FULL DAY IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10203439 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10027314.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 22 - COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES - FULL DAY IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10203432 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10027307.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 22 - COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES - FULL DAY IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10203432 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10027307.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/16/2008 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/16/2008 09:00:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (AND DOES 1-25) FILED BY POST MODERN EDIT LLC ON 09/16/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (AND DOES 1-25) FILED BY POST MODERN EDIT LLC ON 09/16/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2008-09-15 14:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2008-09-15 14:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/15/2008 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/15/2008 09:00:00 AM.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY POST MODERN EDIT LLC ON 09/08/2008

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY POST MODERN EDIT LLC ON 09/08/2008

OPPOSITION FILED BY COOKSEY, ALAN D ON 09/03/2008

OPPOSITION FILED BY COOKSEY, ALAN D ON 09/03/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 7.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10193280 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10017146.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 7.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10193280 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10017146.

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2008
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (COMPLAINT) FILED BY COOKSEY, ALAN D ON 10/22/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 3.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10227797 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10051672.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 3.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10212607 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10036482.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY POST MODERN EDIT LLC ON 09/29/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY POST MODERN EDIT LLC ON 09/29/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBITS RECEIVED IN EVIDENCE - JOINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2008
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2008
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY POST MODERN EDIT LLC ON 08/28/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2007
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT (CROSS-COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY POST MODERN EDIT LLC ON 08/13/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2007
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY POST MODERN EDIT LLC ON 08/13/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2007
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT/PETITION) WAS FILED BY POST MODERN EDIT LLC ON 08/13/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE BY COUNSEL OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) WAS FILED BY ALAN D COOKSEY ON 08/08/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 08/03/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY ALAN D COOKSEY ON 08/01/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2007
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY ALAN D COOKSEY ON 06/28/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2007
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY ALAN D COOKSEY ON 06/28/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2007
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 06/28/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POST MODERN EDIT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REED SMITH (LORENZO GASPARETTI)