This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 05:34:33 (UTC).

COLUMBIA VS ZEIGER

Case Summary

On 05/01/2006 COLUMBIA filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against ZEIGER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1854

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES, INC.

Respondent

RICHARD ZEIGER

Assignees

SACOR FINANCIAL INC

HILCO RECEIVABLES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Assignee Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN J. PUGH

LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH W. SCALIA

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12304133 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12127873.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12304133 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12127873.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 02/22/2018) RECEIVED ON 02/20/2018.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 02/22/2018) RECEIVED ON 02/20/2018.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (WORKSHEET) FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL INC ON 02/20/2018

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (WORKSHEET) FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL INC ON 02/20/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12125695 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11949518.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12125695 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11949518.

WRIT (ISSUED 3/20/17) RECEIVED ON 03/15/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED 3/20/17) RECEIVED ON 03/15/2017.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL INC ON 03/15/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL INC ON 03/15/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12086014 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11909982.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12086014 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11909982.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 01/05/2017) RECEIVED ON 12/30/2016.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 01/05/2017) RECEIVED ON 12/30/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY HILCO RECEIVABLES, LLC ON 08/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY HILCO RECEIVABLES, LLC ON 08/01/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11973045 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11797196.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11973045 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11797196.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 5/25/16) RECEIVED ON 05/25/2016.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 5/25/16) RECEIVED ON 05/25/2016.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL INC ON 05/25/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL INC ON 05/25/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL INC ON 05/25/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL INC ON 05/25/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4551138 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4551138 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11972294 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11796445.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11972294 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11796445.

WRIT (ISSUED 5/24/16) RECEIVED ON 05/20/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 5/24/16) RECEIVED ON 05/20/2016.

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL INC ON 05/18/2016

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL INC ON 05/18/2016

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12304133 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12127873.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 02/22/2018) RECEIVED ON 02/20/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (WORKSHEET) FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL INC ON 02/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4816813 RECEIVED ON 02/19/2018 09:07:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12125695 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11949518.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 3/20/17) RECEIVED ON 03/15/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL INC ON 03/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3522078 RECEIVED ON 03/15/2017 09:54:36 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12086014 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11909982.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 01/05/2017) RECEIVED ON 12/30/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (MOTION - GRANTED/DENIED) ON 05/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT/NOTICE RE: ARBITRATION AWARD - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2006
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 05/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2006
  • OTHER ACTIONS (RECEIVED NOT FILED) WAS FILED ON 05/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2006
  • OTHER ACTIONS (RECEIVED NOT FILED) WAS FILED ON 05/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES, INC. ON 05/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED ON 05/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2006
  • MOTION TO COMPEL (MOTION TO COMPEL/CONFIRM ARBITRATION) WAS FILED BY COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES, INC. ON 05/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2006
  • PETITION TO CONFIRM OR VACATE CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD) WAS FILED BY COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES, INC. ON 05/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 05/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.