This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/13/2016 at 08:51:19 (UTC).

COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES VS. PITCHELL

Case Summary

On 03/10/2005 COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against PITCHELL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1288

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES INC.

Defendant

LAUREN PITCHELL

Assignees

SACOR FINANCIAL, INC

HILCO RECEIVALBES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN J. PUGH

Defendant and Assignee Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH W. SCALIA, APC

 

Court Documents

REJECTED AND RETURNED- ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT

REJECTED AND RETURNED- ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES INC. ON 09/22/2008

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES INC. ON 09/22/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE (OF ATTORNEY) FILED BY PUGH, JOHN J:LAW OFFICES OF ON 09/22/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE (OF ATTORNEY) FILED BY PUGH, JOHN J:LAW OFFICES OF ON 09/22/2008

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY HILCO RECEIVALBES, LLC ON 06/27/2013

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY HILCO RECEIVALBES, LLC ON 06/27/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY HILCO RECEIVALBES, LLC ON 06/27/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY HILCO RECEIVALBES, LLC ON 06/27/2013

WRIT (ISSUED, 7/29/2013) RECEIVED ON 06/27/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED, 7/29/2013) RECEIVED ON 06/27/2013.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11418296 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11242168.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11418296 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11242168.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES INC. ON 01/06/2014

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES INC. ON 01/06/2014

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL, INC ON 05/27/2015

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL, INC ON 05/27/2015

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY HILCO RECEIVALBES, LLC ON 05/27/2015

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY HILCO RECEIVALBES, LLC ON 05/27/2015

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 5/27/15) RECEIVED ON 05/27/2015.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 5/27/15) RECEIVED ON 05/27/2015.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY HILCO RECEIVALBES, LLC ON 05/27/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY HILCO RECEIVALBES, LLC ON 05/27/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11790189 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11614499.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11790189 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11614499.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY HILCO RECEIVALBES, LLC ON 07/07/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY HILCO RECEIVALBES, LLC ON 07/07/2015

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 8/20/15) RECEIVED ON 08/14/2015.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 8/20/15) RECEIVED ON 08/14/2015.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11835798 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11660068.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11835798 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11660068.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11835798 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11660068.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 8/20/15) RECEIVED ON 08/14/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3320360 RECEIVED ON 08/14/2015 11:39:45 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY HILCO RECEIVALBES, LLC ON 07/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3305818 RECEIVED ON 07/07/2015 08:50:36 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11790189 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11614499.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY HILCO RECEIVALBES, LLC ON 05/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 5/27/15) RECEIVED ON 05/27/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY HILCO RECEIVALBES, LLC ON 05/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL, INC ON 05/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2005
  • PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD HEARD ON 06/24/2005 AT 08:30:00 IN WJC AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (MOTION - GRANTED/DENIED) ON 06/24/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES INC. ON 05/27/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2005
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION) WAS FILED BY COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES INC. ON 05/27/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2005
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES) WAS FILED BY COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES INC. ON 05/27/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2005
  • NOTICE OF HEARING (NOTICE OF HEARING) WAS FILED BY COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES INC. ON 05/27/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2005
  • PETITION TO CONFIRM OR VACATE CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD) WAS FILED BY COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES INC. ON 03/10/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2005
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES INC. ON 03/10/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2005
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES INC. ON 03/10/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2005
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 03/10/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HILCO RECEIVABLES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sacor Financial, Inc. is a litigant