Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/24/2016 at 03:46:43 (UTC).

COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION VS. SCANLAN

Case Summary

On 08/21/2006 COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SCANLAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3736

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE O

COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK

Defendant

CAROLINE B SCANLAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MANN BRACKEN, LLP

LAW OFFICES OF HARRIS & ZIDE

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11973712 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11797872.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11973712 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11797872.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 05/24/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 05/24/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 05/24/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 05/24/2016

WRIT RECEIVED ON 05/24/2016.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 05/24/2016.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (NON-MILITARY STATUS) FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 12/21/2015

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (NON-MILITARY STATUS) FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 12/21/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 12/21/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 12/21/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 09/30/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 09/30/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10087652 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 112019.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10087652 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 112019.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11973712 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11797872.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 05/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 05/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT RECEIVED ON 05/24/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3417487 RECEIVED ON 05/24/2016 04:19:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (NON-MILITARY STATUS) FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 12/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 12/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4479647 RECEIVED ON 12/19/2015 12:04:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 09/30/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2007
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2007
  • DOCUMENT - OTHER (SPECIAL FILING SEE REMARKS) WAS FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 01/19/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 01/19/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 01/19/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2007
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 01/19/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 01/17/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 09/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 08/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 08/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK ON 08/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLONIAL CREDIT CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF METRIS BANK is a litigant