This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/09/2016 at 10:14:19 (UTC).

COLE VS DHALIWAL

Case Summary

On 12/07/2007 COLE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DHALIWAL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2730

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CRISTIE MARIE COLE

COURTNEY ANE COLE

NANCY COLE

COLIN TRAVIS COLE

CRAIG R COLE

Defendants

NEWPORT CRITICAL CARE PHYSICIANS

HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNI

PARMINDER SINGH DHALIWAL MD

MICHAEL EILBERT

DMITRI V GELFAND MD

WESTON CHANDLER

JENNIFER R KEINER

UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AT IRVINE MED

DARREN J MALINOSKI MD

GREATER NEWPORT PHYSICIANS MEDICAL GRO

MICHAEL J KRUTZIK

DAVID B HOYT MD

DAVID K IMAGAWA MD

GREATER NEWPORT PHYSICIANS MEDICAL GROUP

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

CORNELIUS P. BAHAN, INC.

EVAN T BURGE

NANCY COLE

MADORY ZELL PLEISS & MCGRATH

CREASON & AARVIG LLP

SCHMID & VOILES

BONNE BRIDGES MUELLER O'KEEFE & NICHOLS

SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY COLE, CRAIG R ON 10/13/2010

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY COLE, CRAIG R ON 10/13/2010

MOTION - OTHER - NO FEE (MIL #4) FILED BY REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA; UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AT IRVINE MEDICAL CENTER ON 04/22/2010

MOTION - OTHER - NO FEE (MIL #4) FILED BY REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA; UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AT IRVINE MEDICAL CENTER ON 04/22/2010

MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 6) FILED BY COLE, CRAIG R; COLE, NANCY; COLE, CRISTIE MARIE; COLE, COLIN TRAVIS; COLE, COURTNEY ANE ON 04/22/2010

MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 6) FILED BY COLE, CRAIG R; COLE, NANCY; COLE, CRISTIE MARIE; COLE, COLIN TRAVIS; COLE, COURTNEY ANE ON 04/22/2010

DOCUMENT - OTHER (AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST) FILED BY COLE, CRAIG R; COLE, NANCY; COLE, CRISTIE MARIE; COLE, COLIN TRAVIS; COLE, COURTNEY ANE ON 05/20/2010

DOCUMENT - OTHER (AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST) FILED BY COLE, CRAIG R; COLE, NANCY; COLE, CRISTIE MARIE; COLE, COLIN TRAVIS; COLE, COURTNEY ANE ON 05/20/2010

OBJECTION (TO AND REQUEST TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS' USE OF SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS NOS. 1 AND 2) FILED BY COLE, CRAIG R; COLE, NANCY; COLE, CRISTIE MARIE; COLE, COLIN TRAVIS; COLE, COURTNEY ANE ON 05/28/2010

OBJECTION (TO AND REQUEST TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS' USE OF SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS NOS. 1 AND 2) FILED BY COLE, CRAIG R; COLE, NANCY; COLE, CRISTIE MARIE; COLE, COLIN TRAVIS; COLE, COURTNEY ANE ON 05/28/2010

OBJECTION FILED BY IMAGAWA MD, DAVID K; REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA; HOYT MD, DAVID B; MALINOSKI MD, DARREN J; GELFAND MD, DMITRI V ON 11/12/2009

OBJECTION FILED BY IMAGAWA MD, DAVID K; REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA; HOYT MD, DAVID B; MALINOSKI MD, DARREN J; GELFAND MD, DMITRI V ON 11/12/2009

OPPOSITION (TO MSJ - DARREN J. MALINOSKI) FILED BY COLE, COLIN TRAVIS; COLE, COURTNEY ANE; COLE, CRAIG R; COLE, CRISTIE MARIE ON 11/03/2009

OPPOSITION (TO MSJ - DARREN J. MALINOSKI) FILED BY COLE, COLIN TRAVIS; COLE, COURTNEY ANE; COLE, CRAIG R; COLE, CRISTIE MARIE ON 11/03/2009

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA; UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AT IRVINE MEDICAL CENTER; IMAGAWA MD, DAVID K; HOYT MD, DAVID B; MALINOSKI MD, DARREN J; GELFAND MD, DMITRI V ON 09/14/2009

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA; UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AT IRVINE MEDICAL CENTER; IMAGAWA MD, DAVID K; HOYT MD, DAVID B; MALINOSKI MD, DARREN J; GELFAND MD, DMITRI V ON 09/14/2009

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA; UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AT IRVINE MEDICAL CENTER; IMAGAWA MD, DAVID K; HOYT MD, DAVID B; MALINOSKI MD, DARREN J; GELFAND MD, DMITRI V ON 06/18/2009

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA; UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AT IRVINE MEDICAL CENTER; IMAGAWA MD, DAVID K; HOYT MD, DAVID B; MALINOSKI MD, DARREN J; GELFAND MD, DMITRI V ON 06/18/2009

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN ON 05/28/2009

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN ON 05/28/2009

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN ON 03/17/2009

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN ON 03/17/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR) FILED BY DHALIWAL MD, PARMINDER SINGH ON 12/09/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR) FILED BY DHALIWAL MD, PARMINDER SINGH ON 12/09/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY COLE, NANCY ON 12/04/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY COLE, NANCY ON 12/04/2008

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY DHALIWAL MD, PARMINDER SINGH ON 11/18/2008

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY DHALIWAL MD, PARMINDER SINGH ON 11/18/2008

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY DHALIWAL MD, PARMINDER SINGH ON 11/18/2008

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY DHALIWAL MD, PARMINDER SINGH ON 11/18/2008

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DHALIWAL MD, PARMINDER SINGH ON 11/05/2008

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DHALIWAL MD, PARMINDER SINGH ON 11/05/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10164162 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 188528.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10164162 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 188528.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY COLE, CRAIG R; COLE, NANCY ON 05/22/2008

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY COLE, CRAIG R; COLE, NANCY ON 05/22/2008

267 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2009
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 227 - SUBSEQUENT JURY TRIAL FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10795454 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10619346.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 10/26/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY COLE, CRAIG R ON 10/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY COLE, CRAIG R REJECTED ON 09/24/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 227 - SUBSEQUENT JURY TRIAL FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF 691.14, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10730380 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10554272.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION IN LIMINE ((#7)) FILED BY REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA; UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AT IRVINE MEDICAL CENTER ON 04/22/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION - OTHER - NO FEE (MIL #6) FILED BY REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA; UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AT IRVINE MEDICAL CENTER ON 04/22/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
405 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2008
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 07/28/2008 AT 11:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2008
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/28/2008 AT 11:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2008
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 07/28/2008 AT 11:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY COLE, CRAIG R; COLE, NANCY ON 05/22/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/2008 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2007
  • COLE, NANCY APPOINTED AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2007
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY COLE, CRAIG R; COLE, NANCY ON 12/07/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2007
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY CRAIG R COLE ON 12/07/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2007
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY CRAIG R COLE ON 12/07/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2007
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 12/07/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hoag Memorial Hospital Presbyterian is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA BOARD OF REGENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant