This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/13/2017 at 08:05:22 (UTC).

CLAIM OF GEORGE D. SMEDLEY

Case Summary

On 10/07/2010 CLAIM OF GEORGE D SMEDLEY was filed as a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Claimant

GEORGE D. SMEDLEY

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

ORANGE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 11/21/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 11/21/2014 09:00:00 AM.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (FOR FORFEITURE - CERTIFIED COPY) FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 11/21/2014

STIPULATION AND ORDER (FOR FORFEITURE - CERTIFIED COPY) FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 11/21/2014

ORDER - OTHER (FOR JUDGMENT - CERTIFIED COPY) FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 11/21/2014

ORDER - OTHER (FOR JUDGMENT - CERTIFIED COPY) FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 11/21/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/30/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/30/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/29/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/29/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/25/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/25/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/24/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/24/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/23/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/23/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/22/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/22/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/18/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/18/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/17/2014 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/17/2014 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/17/2014 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/17/2014 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/10/2014 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/10/2014 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/13/2013 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/13/2013 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/02/2013 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/02/2013 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 10/07/2013 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 10/07/2013 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 07/08/2013 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 07/08/2013 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 04/29/2013 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 04/29/2013 09:00:00 AM.

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 11/21/2014 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • PETITION - OTHER DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE 1-5000 DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER (FOR FORFEITURE - CERTIFIED COPY) FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 11/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (FOR JUDGMENT - CERTIFIED COPY) FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 11/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/30/2014 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/29/2014 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/25/2014 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/24/2014 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2011 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/27/2010 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 04/25/2011 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/25/2011 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 04/25/2011 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION - OTHER (FOR FOREFEITURE OF PROPERTY) FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/16/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/27/2010 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SMEDLEY, GEORGE D. ON 10/07/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 10/07/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE 1-5000 FILED BY SMEDLEY, GEORGE D. ON 10/07/2010

    Read MoreRead Less