This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/29/2016 at 06:23:51 (UTC).

CHILDS VS CENTEX HOMES

Case Summary

On 11/02/2006 CHILDS filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CENTEX HOMES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0224

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAJUANA SANFORD

LASHANDA MCVEA

SABINA RODRIGUEZ

STANLEY RODRIGUEZ

DAMON MCVEA

RONALD SANFORD

TIMOTHY DEAN

ERIC CHILDS

ANN MACDONALD

OFELIA DEAN

DARNISHA CHILDS

EDUWINE TORRES

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KERDUS PLASTERING INC

SOUTHWEST FINISH & SUPPLY INC

CROWN SHEET METAL, INC

LEONARD'S CARPET SERVICE, INC.

VICTOR ELECTRIC

PACIFIC MASONRY, INC.

INTERSTATE SHEET METAL INC

PETERSEN-DEAN INC

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT CLAUSEN

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

PRENOVOST NORMANDIN BERGH & DAWE

SCHWARTZ & JANZEN

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. BUREK

DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND, LLP

DAVID A HARRIS

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF KEVIN PEGAN

ADRIENNE D COHEN LAW OFFICE

ANDREWS & RHODES LLP

LEE BAZZO & NISHI LLP

STRICKROTH & PARKER, LLP

MARSHALL, FRENCH & DEGRAVE

MARSHALL FRENCH & DEGRAVE

KOLETSKY MANCINI FELDMAN & MORROW

BAUER ANDERSON LLP

CALLAHAN MC CUNE & WILLIS

NEWMEYER AND DILLION LLP

THOMPSON, TIMOTHY N.: LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 04/20/2010

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 04/20/2010

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 02/24/2010 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 02/24/2010 09:00:00 AM.

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE APPOINTMENT OF AN ELISOR) FILED BY SPECIALTY CONCRETE, INC. ON 02/01/2010

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE APPOINTMENT OF AN ELISOR) FILED BY SPECIALTY CONCRETE, INC. ON 02/01/2010

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 2009-11-10 09:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 2009-11-10 09:00:00.0.

NOTICE - OTHER (OF OSC RE DISMISSAL) FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 08/26/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF OSC RE DISMISSAL) FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 08/26/2009

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY PACIFIC MASONRY, INC. ON 07/27/2009

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY PACIFIC MASONRY, INC. ON 07/27/2009

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY T F KOCH INC ON 07/20/2009

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY T F KOCH INC ON 07/20/2009

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY SPECIALTY CONCRETE, INC. ON 07/20/2009

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY SPECIALTY CONCRETE, INC. ON 07/20/2009

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY T.W.R. ENTERPRISES, INC. ON 05/13/2009

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY T.W.R. ENTERPRISES, INC. ON 05/13/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF POSTING JURY FEES) FILED BY PACIFIC WINDOW CORPORATION ON 05/13/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF POSTING JURY FEES) FILED BY PACIFIC WINDOW CORPORATION ON 05/13/2009

AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) FILED BY CHILDS, DARNISHA ON 08/25/2008

AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) FILED BY CHILDS, DARNISHA ON 08/25/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF SCOPE OF WORK MEETING SCHEDULE TELEPHONIC MEETING) FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 08/04/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF SCOPE OF WORK MEETING SCHEDULE TELEPHONIC MEETING) FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 08/04/2008

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (AMENDMENT #1) FILED BY CHILDS, ERIC ON 06/30/2008

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (AMENDMENT #1) FILED BY CHILDS, ERIC ON 06/30/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 06/27/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 06/27/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10140558 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 164924.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10140558 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 164924.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PACIFIC MASONRY, INC. ON 05/09/2008

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PACIFIC MASONRY, INC. ON 05/09/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 05/07/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 05/07/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 04/16/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 04/16/2008

306 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 04/20/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (CORSS-COMPLAINT FILED 7/3/07) FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 02/23/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 02/24/2010 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 02/18/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 02/18/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 02/18/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 02/18/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10399538.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 01/29/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
447 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT) WAS FILED ON 03/13/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE) WAS FILED BY ERIC CHILDS ON 03/13/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (MASS NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT) WAS FILED ON 03/13/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 02/07/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2007
  • STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT (STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT/REPORT) WAS FILED BY ERIC CHILDS ON 01/19/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 11/16/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 11/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY ERIC CHILDS ON 11/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY ERIC CHILDS ON 11/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 11/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.