This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/28/2017 at 02:03:15 (UTC).

CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS PACIFIC, LLC VS. P. STRUCTURES, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2009 CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS PACIFIC, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against P STRUCTURES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SUPERIOR MASONRY WALLS, LTD

HORIZON HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING, INC.

US AIRCONDITIONING DISTRIBUTORS, INC.

SUPERIOR GUNITE

DYNAMIC PLUMBING COMMERCIAL INC.

PACIFIC MERCANTILE BANK

CARPENTERS SOUTHWEST ADMINISTRATIVE CORPORATION

D.F. PEREZ CONSTRUCTION, INC.

BOARD OF TRUSTEES FOR THE CARPENTERS SOUTHWEST TRUSTS

HORIZON HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC.

FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY

PACIFIC STRUCTURES

INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP

HOLIDAY INN EXPRESS

CAMCO PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.

STATE BANK OF TEXAS

P. STRUCTURES, INC.

DAN B. PINER

CAMCO PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC.

SOCAL HOSPITALITY LLC

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

TENNER JOHNSON LLP

BARNES, CROSBY, FITZGERALD & ZEMAN LLP

HERNQUIST & ASSOCIATES

HUNTER, MOLLOY & SALCIDO, LLP

ALAN I WHITE

GEORGE SYKULSKI, A PROF. LAW CORP.

DECARLO CONNOR & SHANLEY, A PROFESSIONAL CORP.

LANAK & HANNA

THE RODARTI GROUP

RODARTI GROUP

RODARTI GROUP-THE

Other Attorneys

WALSH & WALSH, P.C.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (COMPLAINT DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE) FILED BY PACIFIC MERCANTILE BANK ON 02/28/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (COMPLAINT DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE) FILED BY PACIFIC MERCANTILE BANK ON 02/28/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11032978 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10856870.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11032978 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10856870.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OF CASE 30-2009-00121873) FILED BY SUPERIOR GUNITE ON 03/11/2011

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OF CASE 30-2009-00121873) FILED BY SUPERIOR GUNITE ON 03/11/2011

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY CAMCO PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.; SOCAL HOSPITALITY, LLC; INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP; STATE BANK OF TEXAS ON 11/19/2010

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY CAMCO PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.; SOCAL HOSPITALITY, LLC; INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP; STATE BANK OF TEXAS ON 11/19/2010

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CAMCO PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 09/29/2010

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CAMCO PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 09/29/2010

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY CAMCO PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 09/07/2010

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY CAMCO PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 09/07/2010

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/11/2010 04:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/11/2010 04:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/28/2010 03:40:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/28/2010 03:40:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 134- ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 905.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10515666.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 134- ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 905.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10515666.

MOTION - OTHER - NO FEE (DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY US AIRCONDITIONING DISTRIBUTORS, INC. ON 07/27/2010

MOTION - OTHER - NO FEE (DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY US AIRCONDITIONING DISTRIBUTORS, INC. ON 07/27/2010

NOTICE - OTHER (AMENDED NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES) FILED BY US AIRCONDITIONING DISTRIBUTORS, INC. ON 06/22/2010

NOTICE - OTHER (AMENDED NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES) FILED BY US AIRCONDITIONING DISTRIBUTORS, INC. ON 06/22/2010

TRANSACTION 21479 ACCEPTED.

TRANSACTION 21479 ACCEPTED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY STATE BANK OF TEXAS ON 05/17/2010

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY STATE BANK OF TEXAS ON 05/17/2010

COMPLAINT FILED BY HORIZON HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 01/25/2010

COMPLAINT FILED BY HORIZON HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 01/25/2010

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HORIZON HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC. ON 01/25/2010

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HORIZON HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC. ON 01/25/2010

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 134- ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 355.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10375265.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 134- ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 355.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10375265.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/14/2009 09:17:27 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/14/2009 09:17:27 AM.

303 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2013
  • R#11129123 VOIDED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF E-FILING# 2192014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11305231 IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FEES DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 03/04/2013 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (COMPLAINT DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE) FILED BY PACIFIC MERCANTILE BANK ON 02/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
478 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/14/2009 09:17:27 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 700.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10441317 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10265191.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (ON CROSS COMPLAINT) FILED BY CAMCO PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 08/06/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CAMCO PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 08/06/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CAMCO PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.; SOCAL HOSPITALITY, LLC ON 08/06/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 350.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10309161 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10133036.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER POLOS, PETER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS PACIFIC, LLC ON 02/13/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS PACIFIC, LLC ON 02/13/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS PACIFIC, LLC ON 02/13/2009

    Read MoreRead Less