Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/17/2016 at 06:09:40 (UTC).

CAVALRY VS ZUBKO

Case Summary

On 05/17/2006 CAVALRY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ZUBKO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2094

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC

Defendant

JOHN A ZUBKO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORA

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 06/20/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 06/20/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11975772 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11799918.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11975772 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11799918.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 6/1/16) RECEIVED ON 05/31/2016.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 6/1/16) RECEIVED ON 05/31/2016.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 05/31/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 05/31/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 05/31/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 05/31/2016

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 08/07/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 08/07/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11089595 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10913487.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11089595 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10913487.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 02/23/2012

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 02/23/2012

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 06/11/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 06/11/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10266222 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10090097.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10266222 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10090097.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 12/03/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 12/03/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 12/03/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 12/03/2008

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 06/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4564083 RECEIVED ON 06/20/2016 08:39:29 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11975772 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11799918.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 6/1/16) RECEIVED ON 05/31/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 05/31/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 05/31/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3419540 RECEIVED ON 05/31/2016 03:52:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 08/07/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 08/10/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 08/10/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 08/10/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 08/10/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 08/10/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 08/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 05/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 05/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC ON 05/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 05/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF GMAC is a litigant