This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/25/2016 at 06:15:49 (UTC).

CAVALRY VS KELSEY

Case Summary

On 09/01/2006 CAVALRY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KELSEY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3800

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSI

CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST

Defendant

DEBRA KELSEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORA

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Defendant Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORAT

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 12/18/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 12/18/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 03/26/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 03/26/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 01/15/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 01/15/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11616251 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11440253.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11616251 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11440253.

WRIT (ISSUED 06/25/2014) RECEIVED ON 06/20/2014.

WRIT (ISSUED 06/25/2014) RECEIVED ON 06/20/2014.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 06/20/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 06/20/2014

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 10/31/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 10/31/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 10/14/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 10/14/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11016715 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10840607.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11016715 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10840607.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10892709 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10716601.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10892709 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10716601.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 04/01/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 04/01/2011

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 02/04/2010

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 02/04/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10421464 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10245338.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10421464 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10245338.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 07/08/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 07/08/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 08/29/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 08/29/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10060014 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 84401.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10060014 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 84401.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 12/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 03/26/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 01/15/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11616251 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11440253.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 06/25/2014) RECEIVED ON 06/20/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 06/20/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4207215 RECEIVED ON 06/20/2014 01:52:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • WRIT UPDATED ON 04/23/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 10/31/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 11/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 11/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 11/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 11/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 09/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 09/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 09/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 09/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY INVEST ON 09/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.