Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/29/2016 at 05:22:57 (UTC).

CAVALRY VS HA

Case Summary

On 10/30/2006 CAVALRY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6183

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC

Defendant

TONY V HA SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

ERICA L BRACHFELD

WINN LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 11/21/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 11/21/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11293590 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11117482.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11293590 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11117482.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 01/07/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 01/07/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10918450 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10742342.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10918450 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10742342.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 01/25/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 01/25/2011

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 11/03/2010

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 11/03/2010

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 02/04/2010

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 02/04/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10494520.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10494520.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 05/17/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 05/17/2010

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 02/19/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 02/19/2008

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 11/21/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11293590 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11117482.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 01/07/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2012
  • TRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10918450 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10742342.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 01/25/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 11/03/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 02/04/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2007
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST (MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMNT,ACK. OF CREDIT,DECL OF ACCRUED INTEREST) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 08/03/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2007
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 02/05/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 02/05/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2007
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/O PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 02/05/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2007
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 02/05/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 11/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 10/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC ON 10/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF GMAC is a litigant