This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/28/2016 at 02:19:32 (UTC).

CAPITAL VS FROLOFF

Case Summary

On 10/02/2006 CAPITAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FROLOFF. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5634

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK

Defendant

ALAN W FROLOFF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORA

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING FORWARDED, CERTIFIED TO ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF, WEST DIVISION

NOTICE OF RULING FORWARDED, CERTIFIED TO ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF, WEST DIVISION

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 10/16/2009

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 10/16/2009

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 10/16/2009 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 10/16/2009 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10469536 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10293410.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10469536 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10293410.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/11/2009

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/11/2009

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/11/2009

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/11/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10440772 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10264646.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10440772 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10264646.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 07/31/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 07/31/2009

NOTICE OF RULING MAILED. CERTIFIED COPIES FORWARDED TO SHERIFF/WJC.

NOTICE OF RULING MAILED. CERTIFIED COPIES FORWARDED TO SHERIFF/WJC.

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 10/17/2008

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 10/17/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 10/17/2008 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 10/17/2008 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10208642 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10032517.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10208642 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10032517.

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/19/2008

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/19/2008

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (AS TO ALAN W. FROLOFF) FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/19/2008

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (AS TO ALAN W. FROLOFF) FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/19/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/24/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/24/2008

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (SHERIFF'S PACKAGE W/ORIGINAL CLAIM OF EXEMPTION, HEARING SET FOR 10/17/08) FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/19/2008

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (SHERIFF'S PACKAGE W/ORIGINAL CLAIM OF EXEMPTION, HEARING SET FOR 10/17/08) FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/19/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10190484 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10014350.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10190484 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10014350.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 08/20/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 08/20/2008

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2012
  • TRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 05/17/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FORWARDED, CERTIFIED TO ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF, WEST DIVISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 10/16/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 10/16/2009 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2009
  • CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT SCHEDULED FOR 10/16/2009 AT 08:30:00 AM IN W10 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10469536 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10293410.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/11/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/11/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (SHERIFF'S PACKET) FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/11/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 01/17/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 01/17/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 01/17/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 01/17/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2007
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/O PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 01/17/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2007
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 01/17/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTED) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 10/25/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 10/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 10/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.