This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/24/2016 at 02:30:11 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE VS PULLMAN

Case Summary

On 08/16/2006 CAPITAL ONE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PULLMAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3521

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK

Defendant

BRYAN B PULLMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 02/26/2016

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11121057 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10944949.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11121057 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10944949.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 03/23/2012

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 03/23/2012

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 03/20/2012

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 03/20/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11002784 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10826676.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11002784 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10826676.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/07/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/07/2011

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/07/2011

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/07/2011

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 01/24/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 01/24/2008

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11121057 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10944949.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 03/23/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 03/20/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11002784 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10826676.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED FOR COUNTY OF ORANGE AGAINST DEFENDANT BRYAN B PULLMAN AKA BRYAN PULLMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/07/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/07/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE ON 12/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE ON 12/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE ON 12/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE ON 12/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE ON 12/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE ON 11/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE ON 09/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 08/16/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 08/16/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE ON 08/16/2006

    Read MoreRead Less