This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/03/2016 at 09:14:47 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE VS CREELMAN

Case Summary

On 12/26/2006 CAPITAL ONE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CREELMAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5495

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK

Defendant

PAUL K CREELMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATENAUDE AND FELIX

 

Court Documents

REJECT - WRIT OF EXECUTION

REJECT - WRIT OF EXECUTION

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 08/13/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 08/13/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10462404 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10286278.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10462404 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10286278.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 03/08/2010

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 03/08/2010

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/30/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/30/2010

WRIT SUBMITTED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK REJECTED ON 01/24/2011.

WRIT SUBMITTED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK REJECTED ON 01/24/2011.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 02/16/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 02/16/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10868474 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10692366.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10868474 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10692366.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/29/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/29/2011

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/29/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10868474 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10692366.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2011
  • WRIT ISSUED TO OC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 02/16/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT SUBMITTED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK REJECTED ON 01/24/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/30/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 03/08/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10462404 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10286278.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2007
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2007
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 03/13/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE ON 02/22/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE ON 02/22/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE ON 02/22/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE ON 02/22/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE ON 01/17/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 12/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 12/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE ON 12/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant