This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/23/2016 at 03:44:08 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE V MCGRAW

Case Summary

On 07/28/2006 CAPITAL ONE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MCGRAW. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3324

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK

Defendant

MICHAEL V MCGRAW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORA

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/10/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/10/2009

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - FULL FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/16/2008

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - FULL FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/16/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 09/16/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 09/16/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 13.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10166892 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 191258.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 13.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10166892 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 191258.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 11.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10166879 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 191245.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 11.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10166879 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 191245.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10068642 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 93027.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10068642 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 93027.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 02/20/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 02/20/2008

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/10/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - FULL FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/16/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 09/16/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 13.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10166892 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 191258.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 11.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10166879 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 191245.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10068642 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 93027.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2008
  • WRIT ISSUED FOR LOS ANGELES CO. AGAINST DEFENDANT MICHAEL V MCGRAW AKA MICHAEL MCGRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 02/20/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 03/21/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 01/16/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2007
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 01/16/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE - OTHER) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 12/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 12/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 11/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 11/15/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 07/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 07/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 07/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less