This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/28/2017 at 09:01:27 (UTC).

CAMBRIDGE CREEK CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS. BEAZER HOLDINGS CORP.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2009 CAMBRIDGE CREEK CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BEAZER HOLDINGS CORP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants and Cross Defendants

STAR SHEET METAL

CAMPBELL CONCRETE OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

CBC FRAMING, INC.

REGENCY ALUMINUM, INC.

TILE TRENDS, INC.

ULTRA-WALL, INC.

CAPITAL CABINETS, A DIVISION OF MASTERBRAND CABINETS INC.

BUILDERS SERVICES GROUP, INC.

FASHIONCRAFT FLOORS

COAST WEST PLUMBING OF PARAMOUNT, INC.

LASCO BATHWARE, INC.

LI METAL SYSTEMS, INC.

REGENCY ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC.

INTERIOR SPECIALISTS INC.

SANCHEZ CONSTRUCTION, INC.

BUILDER SERVICES GROUP, INC.

PADILLA CONSTRUCTION

WESTPAC AIR CONDITIONING, INC.

LARRY METHVIN INSTALLATIONS, INC.

PRO-LINE PLASTERING, INC.

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA, LLP

LAW OFFICES OF AARON B. BOOTH

KEVIN PEGAN-LAW OFFICES OF

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

STUTZ ARTIANO SHINOFF & HOLTZ

HAMMONS BALDINO, LLP

LAW OFFICES OF PEGAN & FRASER

Other Attorneys

MARSHALL FRENCH & DEGRAVE

DICKS COGLIANESE LIPSON & SHUQUEM PC

MCMAHON LAW FIRM, INC.

VAN DE POEL, LEVY & ALLEN, LLP

GRAY DUFFY LLP

MARSHALL, FRENCH & DEGRAVE

LYNBERG & WATKINS

GRACE COSGROVE & SCHIRM

ZIMMERMAN & KAHANOWITCH

CRAIG J. SILVER LAW OFFICES

BRADY VORWERCK RYDER & CASPINO

SPRINGEL & FINK LLP

CAROLINE L. DASOVICH & ASSOCIATES

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 02/09/2011 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 02/09/2011 08:30:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY CAMBRIDGE CREEK CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 01/18/2011

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY CAMBRIDGE CREEK CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 01/18/2011

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY CAMBRIDGE CREEK CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 12/27/2010

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY CAMBRIDGE CREEK CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 12/27/2010

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BEAZER HOLDINGS CORP. ON 11/04/2010

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BEAZER HOLDINGS CORP. ON 11/04/2010

OBJECTION (TO THE PROPOSED ORDER FOR MSC) FILED BY CAMPBELL CONCRETE OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 09/22/2010

OBJECTION (TO THE PROPOSED ORDER FOR MSC) FILED BY CAMPBELL CONCRETE OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 09/22/2010

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BEAZER HOLDINGS CORP. ON 09/22/2010

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BEAZER HOLDINGS CORP. ON 09/22/2010

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (NAME CORRECTION) RECEIVED ON 09/17/2010.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (NAME CORRECTION) RECEIVED ON 09/17/2010.

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY STAR SHEET METAL, INC. ON 09/14/2010

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY STAR SHEET METAL, INC. ON 09/14/2010

NOTICE - OTHER (OF CHANGE OF HEARING TIME) FILED BY SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/09/2010

NOTICE - OTHER (OF CHANGE OF HEARING TIME) FILED BY SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/09/2010

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BEAZER HOLDINGS CORP. ON 09/01/2010

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BEAZER HOLDINGS CORP. ON 09/01/2010

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MESA CONTRACTING CORPORATION ON 05/20/2010

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MESA CONTRACTING CORPORATION ON 05/20/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 550.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10417277.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 550.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10417277.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 550.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10403511.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 550.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10403511.

ORDER GRANTING SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE

ORDER GRANTING SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/2009 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/2009 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (ON CROSS COMPLAINT) FILED BY LI METAL SYSTEMS, INC ON 09/30/2009

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (ON CROSS COMPLAINT) FILED BY LI METAL SYSTEMS, INC ON 09/30/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 134- ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 355.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10449100 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10272974.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 134- ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 355.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10449100 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10272974.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GOTHIC LANDSCAPING, INC. ON 08/12/2009

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GOTHIC LANDSCAPING, INC. ON 08/12/2009

386 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CAMBRIDGE CREEK CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 02/15/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 228397 RECEIVED ON 02/15/2011 07:13:36 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 02/09/2011 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
512 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BEAZER HOLDINGS CORP. ON 04/24/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY BEAZER HOLDINGS CORP. ON 04/23/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT - NO FEE FILED BY BEAZER HOLDINGS CORP. ON 04/23/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10361738 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10185612.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CAMBRIDGE CREEK CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 04/17/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 350.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10329138 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10153012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAMBRIDGE CREEK CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 03/12/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAMBRIDGE CREEK CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 03/12/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CAMBRIDGE CREEK CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 03/12/2009

    Read MoreRead Less