This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/11/2016 at 07:17:11 (UTC).

CALFIN V KATKE

Case Summary

On 11/08/2004 CALFIN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KATKE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4536

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALFIN HOLDINGS

Defendant

ADRIAN KATKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF V. IYER

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10067723 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 92108.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10067723 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 92108.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 02/27/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 02/27/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10093304 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 117671.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10093304 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 117671.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 10/21/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 10/21/2008

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 12/28/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 12/28/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10833094 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10656986.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10833094 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10656986.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 08/11/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 08/11/2011

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS; CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 09/03/2013

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS; CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 09/03/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 04/10/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 04/10/2015

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 4/10/2015) RECEIVED ON 04/10/2015.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 4/10/2015) RECEIVED ON 04/10/2015.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 04/10/2015

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 04/10/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11766644 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11590861.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11766644 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11590861.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 05/27/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 05/27/2015

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 05/27/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1260204 RECEIVED ON 05/27/2015 09:41:37 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11766644 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11590861.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 04/10/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 4/10/2015) RECEIVED ON 04/10/2015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 04/10/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3275693 RECEIVED ON 04/10/2015 01:55:10 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS; CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 09/03/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1109715 RECEIVED ON 09/03/2013 02:32:01 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2005
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 07/18/2005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • DocketOTHER ACTIONS (REJECTED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 04/15/2005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2005
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 04/06/2005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2005
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 03/25/2005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2005
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 03/25/2005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 01/24/2005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2004
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED (SUMMONS RETURNED) WAS FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 12/21/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2004
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 12/08/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY CALFIN HOLDINGS ON 11/08/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 11/08/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Calfin Holdings, LLC is a litigant