This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/15/2016 at 04:43:26 (UTC).

BUWALDA CONSTRUCTION CO INC VS ALDANA PLASTERING

Case Summary

On 03/16/2006 BUWALDA CONSTRUCTION CO INC filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against ALDANA PLASTERING. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0045

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUWALDA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ALDANA PLASTERING

TRU-CUT BUILDERS

COAST SHEET METAL INC

HART PLASTERING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHAFFER LAX MCNAUGHTON AND CHEN

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL

GIARDINELLI DUKE & SIMMONS LLP

BROWNWOOD CHAZEN AND CANNON

LAFOLLETTE JOHNSON DEHAAS FESLER & AMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2007
  • DocketMINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 07/13/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2007
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY ROOFLINE INC ON 06/26/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY ROBERT C METCALF INC ON 06/22/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2007
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY ROBERT C METCALF INC ON 06/19/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2007
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY BUWALDA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC ON 06/15/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • DocketMINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 06/15/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • DocketMINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 04/16/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2007
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) WAS FILED BY BUWALDA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC ON 04/10/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • DocketMINUTES GENERATED (SETTLED - MATTER) ON 03/29/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2007
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE) WAS FILED BY BUWALDA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC ON 03/21/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2006
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT/PETITION) WAS FILED BY ROBERT C METCALF INC ON 05/25/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY BUWALDA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC ON 05/17/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2006
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT/PETITION) WAS FILED BY FIRST CLASS GLASS INC ON 05/05/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2006
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT/PETITION) WAS FILED BY TRU-CUT BUILDERS ON 05/04/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2006
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE - OTHER) WAS FILED BY BUWALDA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC ON 04/04/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • DocketMINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 03/29/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 03/16/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY BUWALDA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC ON 03/16/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY BUWALDA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC ON 03/16/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 03/16/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less