Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/16/2016 at 04:35:01 (UTC).

BOYER VS FITZSIMON

Case Summary

On 04/03/2006 BOYER filed an Other lawsuit against FITZSIMON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1391

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOYER COMPANY

Defendants

OWEN FITZSIMON

FITZSIMON CONSTRUCTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARCHER NORRIS APC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 09/29/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 09/29/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10309474 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10133349.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10309474 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10133349.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE (RE REINSTATED BENCH WARRANT RECALLED) FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 01/28/2009

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE (RE REINSTATED BENCH WARRANT RECALLED) FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 01/28/2009

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 01/09/2009

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 01/09/2009

NOTICE OF RULING MAILED.

NOTICE OF RULING MAILED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR 01/20/2009 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR 01/20/2009 09:00:00 AM.

REJECT - BENCH WARRANT

REJECT - BENCH WARRANT

JUDGMENT AFTER MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ENTER JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT AFTER MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ENTER JUDGMENT

ORDER - OTHER (PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ENTER JUDGMENT) FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 12/05/2008

ORDER - OTHER (PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ENTER JUDGMENT) FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 12/05/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10237663 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10061538.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10237663 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10061538.

BENCH WARRANT RETURNED FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 06/17/2008

BENCH WARRANT RETURNED FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 06/17/2008

REJECT. BENCH WARRANT. ENCLOSED IS THE BENCH WARRANT FORM THAT SHOULD BE COMPLETED AND SUBMITTED WITH THE INSTRUCTIONS. PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT.

REJECT. BENCH WARRANT. ENCLOSED IS THE BENCH WARRANT FORM THAT SHOULD BE COMPLETED AND SUBMITTED WITH THE INSTRUCTIONS. PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 03/04/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 03/04/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 03/03/2008 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 03/03/2008 08:30:00 AM.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (RE: OJD) FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 02/13/2008

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (RE: OJD) FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 02/13/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10044366 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 68779.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10044366 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 68779.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 01/30/2008

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 01/30/2008

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 09/29/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10309474 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10133349.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • WRIT ISSUED FOR ORANGE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED AGAINST OWEN FITZSIMON; FITZSIMON CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE (RE REINSTATED BENCH WARRANT RECALLED) FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 01/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 02/05/2009 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • WARRANT ORDERED AGAINST OWEN FITZSIMON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • BAIL ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF 5,000.00 FOR FITZSIMON,OWEN ON 02/05/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 08/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 08/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 08/04/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 06/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 06/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 05/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 05/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 04/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY BOYER COMPANY ON 04/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 04/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOYER is a litigant