This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/19/2016 at 07:55:13 (UTC).

BECKER VS MILLS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/16/2007 BECKER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MILLS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3968

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILVIA BECKER

Defendants

THE MILLS CORPORATION

THE BLOCK AT ORANGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREWER, JACK D-LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

GATES O'DOHERTY GONTER & GUY LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11108194 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10932086.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11108194 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10932086.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11108192 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10932084.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11108192 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10932084.

CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED

CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION REJECTED ON 11/03/2009.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION REJECTED ON 11/03/2009.

DOCUMENT - OTHER (JOINT WITNESS LIST) FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION ON 06/22/2009

DOCUMENT - OTHER (JOINT WITNESS LIST) FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION ON 06/22/2009

JOINT STATEMENT (OF CASE) FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION ON 09/12/2008

JOINT STATEMENT (OF CASE) FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION ON 09/12/2008

EXHIBIT LIST (JOINT) FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION ON 06/22/2009

EXHIBIT LIST (JOINT) FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION ON 06/22/2009

STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY BECKER, SILVIA ON 09/12/2008

STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY BECKER, SILVIA ON 09/12/2008

STATEMENT OF CASE FILED BY BECKER, SILVIA ON 09/12/2008

STATEMENT OF CASE FILED BY BECKER, SILVIA ON 09/12/2008

MOTION IN LIMINE (NO 5) FILED BY BECKER, SILVIA ON 09/12/2008

MOTION IN LIMINE (NO 5) FILED BY BECKER, SILVIA ON 09/12/2008

MOTION IN LIMINE (NO 4) FILED BY BECKER, SILVIA ON 09/12/2008

MOTION IN LIMINE (NO 4) FILED BY BECKER, SILVIA ON 09/12/2008

MOTION IN LIMINE (NO 3) FILED BY BECKER, SILVIA ON 09/12/2008

MOTION IN LIMINE (NO 3) FILED BY BECKER, SILVIA ON 09/12/2008

MOTION IN LIMINE (NO 2) FILED BY BECKER, SILVIA ON 09/12/2008

MOTION IN LIMINE (NO 2) FILED BY BECKER, SILVIA ON 09/12/2008

MOTION IN LIMINE (NO 1) FILED BY BECKER, SILVIA ON 09/12/2008

MOTION IN LIMINE (NO 1) FILED BY BECKER, SILVIA ON 09/12/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 06/22/2009 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 06/22/2009 09:00:00 AM.

CASE REASSIGNED TO FIRMAT,FRANCISCO EFFECTIVE 05/04/2009.

CASE REASSIGNED TO FIRMAT,FRANCISCO EFFECTIVE 05/04/2009.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 04/06/2009 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 04/06/2009 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION ON 03/18/2009

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION ON 03/18/2009

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11108194 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10932086.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11108192 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10932084.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION REJECTED ON 11/03/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT - OTHER (JOINT WITNESS LIST) FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION ON 06/22/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STATEMENT (OF CASE) FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION ON 09/12/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT LIST (JOINT) FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION ON 06/22/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY BECKER, SILVIA ON 09/12/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CASE FILED BY BECKER, SILVIA ON 09/12/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION IN LIMINE (NO 5) FILED BY BECKER, SILVIA ON 09/12/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2007
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 04/23/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2007
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT/PETITION) WAS FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION ON 04/11/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY SILVIA BECKER ON 04/11/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTED) WAS FILED BY SILVIA BECKER ON 04/11/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY SILVIA BECKER ON 04/11/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • DocketMINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 04/02/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2007
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION RE: DISQUALIFICATION OF JUDGE) WAS FILED BY SILVIA BECKER ON 03/23/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2007
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY SILVIA BECKER ON 03/16/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY SILVIA BECKER ON 03/16/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2007
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 03/16/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BLOCK AT ORANGE is a litigant

Latest cases where MILLS LLC CATALINA CARPET is a litigant