This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/18/2016 at 03:03:59 (UTC).

BARTHOLOMEW VS KB HOME

Case Summary

On 06/20/2006 BARTHOLOMEW filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0120

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JEANNINE EAGLES

ALICIA GONZALEZ

JENNIFER MITCHELL

JOEL NIGRO

TRACY WHEELER

MAURICIO MORA

MARK WHEELER

DANA GRASMAN

EDWIN GONZALEZ

RON CATANZARITI

DANIEL EAGLES

CHARLES MITCHELL

PATSY MORRIS

KAREN BARTHOLOMEW

JAMES BURNS

LORI GASS

CHRISTINE HAUSER

JESSICA MORA

DANIEL ROBBINS

KIM WILSON

116 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GELFER LAW GROUP

Other Attorneys

ANDREWS & RHODES LLP

CARY AND DOLLAR LLP

SPRINGEL & FINK LLP

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

HOWARD STRICKROTH & PARKER LLP

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

SUSSON & PARRETT

HINES SMITH CARDER DINCEL BLAND

SILVER, CRAIG J: LAW OFFICES OF

MARSHALL FRENCH & DEGRAVE

LAW OFFICES OF ADRIENNE D COHEN

HINES SMITH

GRAY * DUFFY, LLP

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & OMEARA LLP

LORBER GREENFIELD & POLITO LLP

MARK J. SKAPIK APC-LAW OFFICE OF

FREDRICKSON MAZEIKA & GRANT LLP

LASCO BATHWARE INC

LETOFSKY MCCLAIN

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 2008-05-05 09:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 2008-05-05 09:00:00.0.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 04/28/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 04/28/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 04/28/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 04/28/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 04/14/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 04/14/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 04/03/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 04/03/2008

STIPULATION AND ORDER (REGARDING DISMISSAL OF FOREST ROOFING CO INC.) FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 04/01/2008

STIPULATION AND ORDER (REGARDING DISMISSAL OF FOREST ROOFING CO INC.) FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 04/01/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY MCCONNELL CABINETS INC ON 03/28/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY MCCONNELL CABINETS INC ON 03/28/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 5-1-07) FILED BY HORIZON PLUMBING INC ON 03/21/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 5-1-07) FILED BY HORIZON PLUMBING INC ON 03/21/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF OSC RE DISMISSAL) FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 03/19/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF OSC RE DISMISSAL) FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 03/19/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF AMENDED TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE DATE) FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 03/04/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF AMENDED TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE DATE) FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 03/04/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY TOMKINS INDUSTRIES INC ON 02/27/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY TOMKINS INDUSTRIES INC ON 02/27/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10056160 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 80567.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10056160 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 80567.

MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY MIDAS SERVICES INC ON 02/13/2008

MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY MIDAS SERVICES INC ON 02/13/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 01/09/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 01/09/2008

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY RII PLASTERING INC ON 02/04/2008

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY RII PLASTERING INC ON 02/04/2008

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY TOMKINS INDUSTRIES INC ON 02/01/2008

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY TOMKINS INDUSTRIES INC ON 02/01/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY TOMKINS INDUSTRIES INC ON 02/01/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY TOMKINS INDUSTRIES INC ON 02/01/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC ON 01/25/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC ON 01/25/2008

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2008
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 06/16/2008 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 06/13/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF FURTHER OSC RE: DISMISSASL) FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 06/05/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 05/30/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 05/28/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 05/28/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 06/02/2008 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2008
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2008 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX104 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME INC ON 05/20/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
346 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY WARREN BARTHOLOMEW ON 08/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY WARREN BARTHOLOMEW ON 08/11/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2006
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT (AMENDED COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY WARREN BARTHOLOMEW ON 08/11/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 07/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 06/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2006
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION RE: DISQUALIFICATION OF JUDGE) WAS FILED BY WARREN BARTHOLOMEW ON 06/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2006
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 06/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY WARREN BARTHOLOMEW ON 06/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY WARREN BARTHOLOMEW ON 06/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 06/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.