This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/03/2016 at 09:56:10 (UTC).

BARDOWELL VS CENTEX HOMES

Case Summary

On 12/28/2006 BARDOWELL filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CENTEX HOMES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0274

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DANIEL HUSS

JOSEPH RYAN

SCOTT TOLONE

CHARLOTTE WALKER

CHRISTINA SABERS

ALLISON HUKE

ED LEYBA

RHONDA JACOBSON

JULIE LYNCH

TISH PILON

ANN SCHLINGMAN

ELEANOR BONES

SUSAN BRENHAUG

MARY GRABOT

CHRISTI VAIL-THRONSON

TRACY DEAN

BARBARA PROVENCE

HABIB BARDOWELL

ROBERT GRABOT

ANTHONY PECORARO

67 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GELFER LAW GROUP

Other Attorneys

LIEDLE GETTY & WILSON LLP

ADRIENNE D. COHEN

ANDREWS & RHODES LLP

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

HINES SMITH CARDER DINCEL BLAND

DAVID A HARRIS

KOELLER NEBEKER CARLSON & HALUCK

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY GATEWAY PLASTERING, INC. ON 12/09/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY GATEWAY PLASTERING, INC. ON 12/09/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 2008-12-08 10:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 2008-12-08 10:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 2008-06-26 09:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 2008-06-26 09:00:00.0.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY RALPH D. MITZEL, INC. ON 06/30/2008

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY RALPH D. MITZEL, INC. ON 06/30/2008

STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CENTEX HOMES; CENTEX REAL ESTATE CORPORATION ON 06/30/2008

STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CENTEX HOMES; CENTEX REAL ESTATE CORPORATION ON 06/30/2008

ORDER - OTHER (REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AND ORDER) FILED BY PETERSEN-DEAN, INC. ON 06/25/2008

ORDER - OTHER (REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AND ORDER) FILED BY PETERSEN-DEAN, INC. ON 06/25/2008

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CENTEX HOMES; CENTEX REAL ESTATE CORPORATION ON 06/10/2008

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CENTEX HOMES; CENTEX REAL ESTATE CORPORATION ON 06/10/2008

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CENTEX HOMES; CENTEX REAL ESTATE CORPORATION ON 06/10/2008

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CENTEX HOMES; CENTEX REAL ESTATE CORPORATION ON 06/10/2008

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SANTANA CONCRETE, INC. ON 05/15/2008

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SANTANA CONCRETE, INC. ON 05/15/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CAPITAL DRYWALL, INC. ON 05/13/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CAPITAL DRYWALL, INC. ON 05/13/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10115902 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 140268.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10115902 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 140268.

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CAPITAL DRYWALL, INC. ON 05/13/2008

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CAPITAL DRYWALL, INC. ON 05/13/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GATEWAY PLASTERING, INC. ON 05/13/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GATEWAY PLASTERING, INC. ON 05/13/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10115823 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 140189.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10115823 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 140189.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 05/12/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 05/12/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 05/12/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 05/12/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 05/12/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 05/12/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 04/14/2008 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 04/14/2008 08:30:00 AM.

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY GATEWAY PLASTERING, INC. ON 12/09/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY CAPITAL DRYWALL, INC. ON 12/09/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 2008-12-08 10:00:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • COURT ORDERED ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BARDOWELL, HABIB ON 11/19/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY CENTEX HOMES; CENTEX REAL ESTATE CORPORATION ON 11/19/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL) FILED BY BARDOWELL, HABIB ON 11/06/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 11/06/2008 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL CONTINUED TO 12/08/2008 AT 10:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2007
  • STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT (STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT/REPORT) WAS FILED BY HABIB BARDOWELL ON 04/20/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2007
  • ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO AMENDED COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY CENTEX HOMES ON 04/19/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2007
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/O PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY HABIB BARDOWELL ON 03/20/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2007
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY HABIB BARDOWELL ON 03/19/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2007
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT (AMENDED COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY HABIB BARDOWELL ON 03/07/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 01/05/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2007
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY HABIB BARDOWELL ON 01/02/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2006
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED BY HABIB BARDOWELL ON 12/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY HABIB BARDOWELL ON 12/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 12/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.