This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/11/2016 at 11:23:26 (UTC).

BANK VS BERMUDES

Case Summary

On 11/30/2004 BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BERMUDES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6331

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA

Defendant

JULIA BERMUDES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORA

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 09/09/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 09/09/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 09/09/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 09/09/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10204852 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10028727.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10204852 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10028727.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (AS TO JULIA BERMUDES) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 11/14/2008

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (AS TO JULIA BERMUDES) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 11/14/2008

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 11/14/2008

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 11/14/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10247293 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10071168.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10247293 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10071168.

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (SHERIFF'S PACKAGE W/ORIGINAL CLAIM OF EXEMPTION) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 11/18/2008

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (SHERIFF'S PACKAGE W/ORIGINAL CLAIM OF EXEMPTION) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 11/18/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - LEVY 12/12/2008 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - LEVY 12/12/2008 08:30:00 AM.

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 12/12/2008

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 12/12/2008

NOTICE OF RULING MAILED. CERTIFIED COPIES MAILED TO OC SHERIFF, NORTH DIVISION.

NOTICE OF RULING MAILED. CERTIFIED COPIES MAILED TO OC SHERIFF, NORTH DIVISION.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 04/02/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 04/02/2009

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2012
  • DocketTRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 04/02/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING MAILED. CERTIFIED COPIES MAILED TO OC SHERIFF, NORTH DIVISION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 12/12/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - LEVY 12/12/2008 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLAIM OF EXEMPTION (SHERIFF'S PACKAGE W/ORIGINAL CLAIM OF EXEMPTION) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 11/18/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10247293 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10071168.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2008
  • DocketCLAIM OF EXEMPTION - LEVY SCHEDULED FOR 12/12/2008 AT 08:30:00 AM IN W10 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 11/14/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (AS TO JULIA BERMUDES) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 11/14/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2005
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 04/01/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 04/01/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 04/01/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 04/01/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/O PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 04/01/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 04/01/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2005
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 03/30/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2005
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 02/22/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2004
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 11/30/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2004
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 11/30/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant