Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/16/2016 at 12:24:55 (UTC).

ATLANTIC VS HASSANEIN

Case Summary

On 05/02/2006 ATLANTIC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HASSANEIN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2406

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE

Defendant

NABIL HASSANEIN

Assignee

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEORGE L COHN

Defendant and Assignee Attorney

GEORGE L. COHN

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/26/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/26/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10888778 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10712670.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10888778 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10712670.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 03/29/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 03/29/2011

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 03/29/2011

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 03/29/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 09/25/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 09/25/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10083429 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 107796.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10083429 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 107796.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN (INTEREST $790.96) FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 03/25/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN (INTEREST $790.96) FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 03/25/2008

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2012
  • TRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/26/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10888778 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10712670.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2011
  • WRIT ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 03/29/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 03/29/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 09/25/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10083429 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 107796.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2008
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED FOR ORANGE CO. $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN (INTEREST $790.96) FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 03/25/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2006
  • DOCUMENT - OTHER (SPECIAL FILING SEE REMARKS) WAS FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 07/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 07/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2006
  • DOCUMENT - OTHER (SPECIAL FILING SEE REMARKS) WAS FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 07/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 07/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2006
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/O PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 07/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 07/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 05/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 05/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 05/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ON 05/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atlantic Credit & Fin Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHN GEORGE L.