This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/12/2016 at 06:58:23 (UTC).

ATLANTIC VS ALONZO

Case Summary

On 01/31/2006 ATLANTIC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALONZO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0420

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC

Defendant

BLANCA E ALONZO

Assignee

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignee Attorney

GEORGE L COHN

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11607992 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11431961.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11607992 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11431961.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 06/09/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 06/09/2014

WRIT (ISSUED 6/10/14) RECEIVED ON 06/09/2014.

WRIT (ISSUED 6/10/14) RECEIVED ON 06/09/2014.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 07/03/2012

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 07/03/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11050070 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10873962.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11050070 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10873962.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 12/14/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 12/14/2011

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/05/2011

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/05/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 02/14/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 02/14/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 07/20/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 07/20/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10525852.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10525852.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 12/09/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 12/09/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10132703 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 157069.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10132703 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 157069.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 05/14/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 05/14/2008

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11607992 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11431961.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 06/09/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 6/10/14) RECEIVED ON 06/09/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4201039 RECEIVED ON 06/07/2014 01:21:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 07/03/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11050070 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10873962.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 12/14/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/05/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 04/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2006
  • DOCUMENT - OTHER (SPECIAL FILING SEE REMARKS) WAS FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 04/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 04/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 04/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 04/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED ON 03/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 02/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 01/31/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC ON 01/31/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 01/31/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.