Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/03/2016 at 07:17:00 (UTC).

ARNEL VS FUENTES

Case Summary

On 12/20/2006 ARNEL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FUENTES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5426

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Defendant

VICENTE FUENTES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN, LLP

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 10/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 10/17/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12044791 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11868756.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12044791 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11868756.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 10/12/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 10/12/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 10/12/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 10/12/2016

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 10/13/16) RECEIVED ON 10/12/2016.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 10/13/16) RECEIVED ON 10/12/2016.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 10/12/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 10/12/2016

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 09/13/2016

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 09/13/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 09/13/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 09/13/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 09/13/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 09/13/2016

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 09/12/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 09/12/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10082684 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 107051.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10082684 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 107051.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP ON 03/26/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP ON 03/26/2008

NOTICE TO FILING PARTY - ABSTRACT REJECTED

NOTICE TO FILING PARTY - ABSTRACT REJECTED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10071705 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 96090.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10071705 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 96090.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 01/28/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 01/28/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY KIMBALL, TIREY & ST JOHN, LLP ON 01/28/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY KIMBALL, TIREY & ST JOHN, LLP ON 01/28/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10033856 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 58269.

PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10033856 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 58269.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 10/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4621528 RECEIVED ON 10/17/2016 10:25:30 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12044791 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11868756.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 10/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 10/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 10/13/16) RECEIVED ON 10/12/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 10/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4619762 RECEIVED ON 10/12/2016 03:25:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 09/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 09/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2007
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY UD - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2007
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION) WAS FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 01/23/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2007
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 01/23/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 01/23/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 01/19/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2006
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (APPL & ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING (UD)) WAS FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 12/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED) WAS FILED ON 12/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 12/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 12/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 12/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC. is a litigant