Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/29/2016 at 02:37:35 (UTC).

ARNEL VS BENNETT

Case Summary

On 01/24/2006 ARNEL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BENNETT. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0299

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER ROBIN BENNETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST JOHN, LLP

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 08/17/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 08/17/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11831370 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11655638.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11831370 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11655638.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 08/12/2015

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 08/12/2015

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 8/13/15) RECEIVED ON 08/12/2015.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 8/13/15) RECEIVED ON 08/12/2015.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 08/12/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 08/12/2015

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 08/12/2015

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 08/12/2015

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 08/17/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3320718 RECEIVED ON 08/17/2015 08:35:37 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11831370 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11655638.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 08/12/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 8/13/15) RECEIVED ON 08/12/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 08/12/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 08/12/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1274016 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2015 02:50:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2006
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (EX PARTE MOTION/APPLICATION) WAS FILED BY CHRISTOPHER ROBIN BENNETT ON 02/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 02/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2006
  • WRIT ISSUED ON 02/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY UD - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2006
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION) WAS FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 01/31/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 01/31/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 01/31/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 01/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT CO ON 01/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 01/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC. is a litigant