This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/13/2016 at 11:07:26 (UTC).

ARCHSTONE-SMITH VS TRAN

Case Summary

On 03/21/2005 ARCHSTONE-SMITH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TRAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1494

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC

Defendants

HUONG N NGUYEN

MY T TRAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST JOHN, LLP

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10902760 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10726652.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10902760 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10726652.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 05/09/2011

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 05/09/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 05/09/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 05/09/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 04/02/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 04/02/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 03/28/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 03/28/2013

NOTICE OF DISCHARGE (BANKRUPTCY) FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 03/28/2013

NOTICE OF DISCHARGE (BANKRUPTCY) FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 03/28/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 03/28/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 03/28/2013

WRIT (ISSUED ON 06/01/2013) RECEIVED ON 05/28/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 06/01/2013) RECEIVED ON 05/28/2013.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 05/28/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 05/28/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS) FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 05/28/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS) FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 05/28/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11383480 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11207372.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11383480 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11207372.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 11/27/2013

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 11/27/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 03/25/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 03/25/2015

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 03/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 11/27/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 387772 RECEIVED ON 11/27/2013 07:51:55 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11383480 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11207372.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS) FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 05/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 05/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 06/01/2013) RECEIVED ON 05/28/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 322464 RECEIVED ON 05/28/2013 11:38:25 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 03/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DISCHARGE (BANKRUPTCY) FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 03/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2005
  • WRIT ISSUED ON 04/11/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2005
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY UD - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2005
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION) WAS FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 04/11/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2005
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 04/11/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTED) WAS FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 04/11/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTED) WAS FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 04/11/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2005
  • SUMMONS RETURNED (SUMMONS RETURNED) WAS FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 04/11/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2005
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED) WAS FILED ON 03/22/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2005
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY ARCHSTONE-SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC ON 03/21/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2005
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 03/21/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARCHSTONE SMITH COMMUNITIES LLC is a litigant