This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/28/2016 at 03:32:23 (UTC).

AMINY VS LEWIS HOMES ENTERPRISES

Case Summary

On 10/06/2006 AMINY filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against LEWIS HOMES ENTERPRISES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0207

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RONALD PULHAM

JOHN PHAM

DORALBA HENAO MONTOYA

STEVE HANOKA

RICHARD MORGAN

ARAN SAHAGUN

NICOLE SAHAGUN

MARISA WHITAKER

CARMEN RHOADS

SAHAR AMINY

WILKINS MELIAN

YANMIN QU

SHERIDAN SAVIO

THUAN QUOC TRUONG

HAI TRAN

TIMOTHY C MYERS

JAMES BENNETT

NARGIS AMINY

NADER BIGDELI

PAULA DUFAULT

120 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILSTEIN ADELMAN & KREGER LLP

Other Attorneys

NEWMEYER AND DILLION LLP

DEMLER ARMSTRONG AND ROWLAND

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

MARSHALL FRENCH & DEGRAVE

HAMNER LAW OFFICES, LLC

O'CONNOR PACKER & DUNIVAN

STUTZ ARTIANO SHINOFF & HOLTZ

ANNE MARIE HEALY-LAW OFFICES OF

HINES SMITH CARDER DINCEL BLAND

BRADY VORWERCK RYDER AND CASPINO

MORROW & WHITE

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & OMEARA LLP

KRUTCIK & GEORGGIN

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP

LONG, WILLIAMSON & DELIS

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

HORTON OBERRECHT KIRKPATRICK & MARTHA

MARANGA & MORGENSTERN

BRADY VORWERCK RYDER & CASPINO

17 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE (RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) FILED BY DICARLO CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC ON 07/18/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE (RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) FILED BY DICARLO CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC ON 07/18/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY COMMERCIAL WOOD PRODUCTS COMPANY ON 07/07/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY COMMERCIAL WOOD PRODUCTS COMPANY ON 07/07/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT) FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 06/23/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT) FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 06/23/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE (RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; APPLICATION AND PROPOSED ORDER) FILED BY COMMERCIAL WOOD PRODUCTS COMPANY ON 05/30/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE (RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; APPLICATION AND PROPOSED ORDER) FILED BY COMMERCIAL WOOD PRODUCTS COMPANY ON 05/30/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 04/29/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 04/29/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE (NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT ; APPLICATION AND PROPOSED ORDER) FILED BY TWR ENTERPRISES INC ON 04/15/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE (NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT ; APPLICATION AND PROPOSED ORDER) FILED BY TWR ENTERPRISES INC ON 04/15/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 04/14/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 04/14/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10094005 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 118372.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10094005 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 118372.

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC ON 04/08/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC ON 04/08/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 04/03/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 04/03/2008

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SUNCOAST POST TENSION INC ON 04/03/2008

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SUNCOAST POST TENSION INC ON 04/03/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY LEONARDS CARPET SERVICE INC ON 04/02/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY LEONARDS CARPET SERVICE INC ON 04/02/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY TOMKINS INDUSTRIES INC ON 03/27/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY TOMKINS INDUSTRIES INC ON 03/27/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10078216 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 102583.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10078216 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 102583.

MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY SUPERIOR CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/20/2008

MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY SUPERIOR CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/20/2008

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY LEONARDS CARPET SERVICE INC ON 02/22/2008

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY LEONARDS CARPET SERVICE INC ON 02/22/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 02/14/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 02/14/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY LAZAR ELECTRIC INC ON 01/25/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY LAZAR ELECTRIC INC ON 01/25/2008

136 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (AS TO 5TH AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED 6-14-07) FILED BY AMINY, NARGIS; AMINY, SAHAR ON 10/31/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 10/22/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SCHWARTZ CONSTRUCTION ON 09/10/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2008
  • COURT ORDERED ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2008
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER 0F 8/25/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 08/26/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY DICARLO CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC ON 08/25/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
379 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2007
  • ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO AMENDED COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 02/01/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY SAHAR AMINY ON 12/11/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY SAHAR AMINY ON 12/11/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2006
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT (AMENDED COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY SAHAR AMINY ON 11/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY SAHAR AMINY ON 11/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 11/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY SAHAR AMINY ON 10/11/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2006
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 10/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY SAHAR AMINY ON 10/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less