This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/18/2016 at 03:33:38 (UTC).

AMERICAN VS PHAM

Case Summary

On 06/22/2006 AMERICAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PHAM. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3412

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

SANH PHAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MANN BRACKEN, LLP

ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/31/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/31/2016

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/31/2016

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/31/2016

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/15/2016

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/15/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11985798 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11809883.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11985798 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11809883.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 6/20/16) RECEIVED ON 06/17/2016.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 6/20/16) RECEIVED ON 06/17/2016.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (WORKSHEET) FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 06/17/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (WORKSHEET) FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 06/17/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 06/17/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 06/17/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER - OTHER (SUBSTITUTING IN ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. AS COUNSEL) FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 03/29/2016

ORDER - OTHER (SUBSTITUTING IN ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. AS COUNSEL) FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 03/29/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016.

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: OF UNAVAILABILITY OF PRIOR COUNSEL) FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 03/28/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: OF UNAVAILABILITY OF PRIOR COUNSEL) FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 03/28/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 12/03/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 12/03/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/19/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/19/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10058607 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 83014.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10058607 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 83014.

REJECTED & RETURNED: WRIT, $15, CK NO. 099714. DOCS SUBMITTED BEFORE MOTION TO TAX PERIOD EXPIRED.

REJECTED & RETURNED: WRIT, $15, CK NO. 099714. DOCS SUBMITTED BEFORE MOTION TO TAX PERIOD EXPIRED.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER (COSTS=$229, CREDIT=$394.76, INTEREST=$1739.14) FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 01/22/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER (COSTS=$229, CREDIT=$394.76, INTEREST=$1739.14) FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 01/22/2008

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/31/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/31/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4599556 RECEIVED ON 08/31/2016 03:57:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4591085 RECEIVED ON 08/15/2016 11:55:46 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11985798 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11809883.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 6/20/16) RECEIVED ON 06/17/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (WORKSHEET) FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 06/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 06/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4563392 RECEIVED ON 06/17/2016 08:52:28 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2006
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED ON 09/29/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 09/05/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2006
  • DOCUMENT - OTHER (SPECIAL FILING SEE REMARKS) WAS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 09/05/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2006
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/O PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 09/05/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 09/05/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 07/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 06/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 06/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 06/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant