This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/02/2016 at 10:33:07 (UTC).

ALLEN PROPERTIES VS. GARCIA

Case Summary

On 05/14/2001 ALLEN PROPERTIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARCIA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2789

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2001

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEN PROPERTIES

Defendants

CARMEN C. SANCHEZ

RAFAEL GARCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN, LLP

 

Court Documents

LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 11/03/2008

LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 11/03/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 11/03/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 11/03/2008

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF RECORD OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY) FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 11/03/2008

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF RECORD OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY) FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 11/03/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10243946 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10067821.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10243946 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10067821.

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 04/15/2009

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 04/15/2009

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 04/15/2009

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 04/15/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10360475 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10184349.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10360475 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10184349.

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (SHERIFF'S PACKET) FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 04/21/2009

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (SHERIFF'S PACKET) FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 04/21/2009

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 05/08/2009 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 05/08/2009 08:30:00 AM.

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 05/08/2009

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 05/08/2009

NOTICE OF RULING MAILED, CERTIFIED COPIES MAILED TO LA SHERIFF/TORRANCE.

NOTICE OF RULING MAILED, CERTIFIED COPIES MAILED TO LA SHERIFF/TORRANCE.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 08/24/2010

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 08/24/2010

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 10/29/2010

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 10/29/2010

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2012
  • DocketTRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • DocketWRIT UPDATED ON 11/12/2008.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 10/29/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • DocketWRIT UPDATED ON 11/12/2008.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 08/24/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING MAILED, CERTIFIED COPIES MAILED TO LA SHERIFF/TORRANCE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 05/08/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 05/08/2009 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • DocketCLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT SCHEDULED FOR 05/08/2009 AT 08:30:00 AM IN W10 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLAIM OF EXEMPTION (SHERIFF'S PACKET) FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 04/21/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 04/15/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 04/15/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10243946 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10067821.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2008
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2008
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (RE: CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF RECORD OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY) FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 11/03/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 11/03/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2001
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY ALLEN PROPERTIES ON 11/03/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2008
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allen Properties, LLC D/B/A Wendy's is a litigant