This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/18/2016 at 05:48:56 (UTC).

AGARWALA VS MILLS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/23/2007 AGARWALA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MILLS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3212

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TARLA AGARWALA

Defendants

THE MILLS CORPORATION

THE BLOCK AT ORANGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

SHERMAN SALKOW & NEWKIRK

SALKOW LAW FIRM APC

LINER GRODE STEIN YANKELEVITZ SUNSHINE REGENSTREIF & TAYLOR LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AGARWALA, TARLA ON 08/27/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AGARWALA, TARLA ON 08/27/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY AGARWALA, TARLA ON 08/20/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY AGARWALA, TARLA ON 08/20/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY AGARWALA, TARLA ON 07/08/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY AGARWALA, TARLA ON 07/08/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 06/27/2008 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 06/27/2008 01:30:00 PM.

ORDER - OTHER (TO CONTINUE THE MSC) FILED BY AGARWALA, TARLA ON 06/02/2008

ORDER - OTHER (TO CONTINUE THE MSC) FILED BY AGARWALA, TARLA ON 06/02/2008

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (TO MSC) FILED BY AGARWALA, TARLA ON 06/02/2008

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (TO MSC) FILED BY AGARWALA, TARLA ON 06/02/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10125786 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 150152.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10125786 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 150152.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION; THE BLOCK AT ORANGE ON 03/20/2008

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION; THE BLOCK AT ORANGE ON 03/20/2008

ORDER - OTHER (TRIAL CONT. TO 09-22-08 AND MSC TO 06-06-08) FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION ON 02/13/2008

ORDER - OTHER (TRIAL CONT. TO 09-22-08 AND MSC TO 06-06-08) FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION ON 02/13/2008

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION ON 02/19/2008

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION ON 02/19/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 02/13/2008 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 02/13/2008 08:30:00 AM.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL TO ACCOMMODATE NEW COUNSEL) FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION; THE BLOCK AT ORANGE ON 02/07/2008

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL TO ACCOMMODATE NEW COUNSEL) FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION; THE BLOCK AT ORANGE ON 02/07/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10049540 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 73947.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10049540 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 73947.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AGARWALA, TARLA ON 08/27/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2008
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY AGARWALA, TARLA ON 08/20/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY AGARWALA, TARLA ON 07/08/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 06/27/2008 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 09/23/2008 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (TO CONTINUE THE MSC) FILED BY AGARWALA, TARLA ON 06/02/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (TO MSC) FILED BY AGARWALA, TARLA ON 06/02/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2008
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2008 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2008
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2008 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) WAS FILED BY TARLA AGARWALA ON 06/22/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) WAS FILED BY TARLA AGARWALA ON 06/21/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTED) WAS FILED BY TARLA AGARWALA ON 03/23/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2007
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT/PETITION) WAS FILED BY THE MILLS CORPORATION ON 03/21/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY TARLA AGARWALA ON 03/20/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY TARLA AGARWALA ON 03/20/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 03/19/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2007
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY TARLA AGARWALA ON 02/23/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2007
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY TARLA AGARWALA ON 02/23/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2007
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 02/23/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BLOCK AT ORANGE is a litigant

Latest cases where MILLS LLC CATALINA CARPET is a litigant