Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/23/2016 at 04:17:30 (UTC).

ADVANCEME VS SARGERINI FOODS

Case Summary

On 07/31/2006 ADVANCEME filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SARGERINI FOODS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3238

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADVANCEME, INC.

Defendants

SARGERINI FOODS, LLC

JOSEPH MORANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

GREENBAUM LAW GROUP LLP

LAW OFFICES OF STUART A. KATZ

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 05/25/2011

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 05/25/2011

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 03/13/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 03/13/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10199502 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10023377.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10199502 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10023377.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 09/08/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 09/08/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 06/10/2008 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 06/10/2008 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (HEARING ON ORDER FOR APPEARANCE FOR EXAMINATION) FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 05/27/2008

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (HEARING ON ORDER FOR APPEARANCE FOR EXAMINATION) FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 05/27/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 05/21/2008 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 05/21/2008 08:30:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE (APPLICATION & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION) FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 05/06/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE (APPLICATION & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION) FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 05/06/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10085765 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 110132.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10085765 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 110132.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 04/01/2008

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 04/01/2008

COPY OF ORDER AND NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF BANKRUPTCY FILED

COPY OF ORDER AND NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF BANKRUPTCY FILED

NOTICE TO FILING PARTY - ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION REJECTED

NOTICE TO FILING PARTY - ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION REJECTED

NOTICE OF STAY (BANKRUPTCY) FILED BY MORANO, JOSEPH ON 02/08/2008

NOTICE OF STAY (BANKRUPTCY) FILED BY MORANO, JOSEPH ON 02/08/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 01/30/2008 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 01/30/2008 08:30:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 01/10/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 01/10/2008

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 05/25/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 03/13/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10199502 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10023377.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2008
  • WRIT ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY AS TO DEFTS: SARGERINI FOODS, LLC DBA SOPRANO'S; AND JOSEPH MORANO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 09/08/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 06/10/2008 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (HEARING ON ORDER FOR APPEARANCE FOR EXAMINATION) FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 05/27/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 05/21/2008 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 12/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 11/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2006
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND ORDER) WAS FILED ON 11/08/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED ON 11/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 10/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE - OTHER) WAS FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 10/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 09/08/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 07/31/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 07/31/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY ADVANCEME, INC. ON 07/31/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAN CAPITAL MERCHANT SERVICES INC is a litigant