This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/23/2016 at 03:00:37 (UTC).

ADVANCE RESTAURANT FINANCE, LLC VS. DAREMF, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/25/2006 ADVANCE RESTAURANT FINANCE, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against DAREMF, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3247

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADVANCE RESTAURANT FINANCE, LLC, A CAL

ADVANCE RESTAURANT FINANCE, LLC

ADVANCE RESTAURANT FINANCE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

FERNANDA CAPRARO

DAREMF, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DAREMF, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLECTION AT LAW, INC., A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

Defendant Attorney

COLLECTION AT LAW, INC., A PROFESSION

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 12/17/2015 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 12/17/2015 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11868257 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11692455.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11868257 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11692455.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY ADVANCE RESTAURANT FINANCE, LLC ON 10/26/2015

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY ADVANCE RESTAURANT FINANCE, LLC ON 10/26/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11780986 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11605269.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11780986 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11605269.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 05/07/2015) RECEIVED ON 03/26/2015.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 05/07/2015) RECEIVED ON 03/26/2015.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10080328 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 104695.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10080328 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 104695.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY ADVANCE RESTAURANT FINANCE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 03/21/2008

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY ADVANCE RESTAURANT FINANCE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 03/21/2008

APPLICATION & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION SUBMITTED BY ADVANCE RESTAURANT REJECTED

APPLICATION & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION SUBMITTED BY ADVANCE RESTAURANT REJECTED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY ADVANCE RESTAURANT FINANCE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 03/18/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY ADVANCE RESTAURANT FINANCE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 03/18/2008

LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY ADVANCE RESTAURANT FINANCE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 03/18/2008

LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY ADVANCE RESTAURANT FINANCE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 03/18/2008

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 12/17/2015 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 12/17/2015 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11868257 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11692455.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY ADVANCE RESTAURANT FINANCE, LLC ON 10/26/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1286917 RECEIVED ON 10/26/2015 03:46:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11780986 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11605269.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 05/07/2015) RECEIVED ON 03/26/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3269312 RECEIVED ON 03/26/2015 11:49:33 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2008
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 05/28/2008 AT 08:30:00 AM IN S09 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10080328 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 104695.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY ADVANCE RESTAURANT FINANCE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 03/21/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION SUBMITTED BY ADVANCE RESTAURANT REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY ADVANCE RESTAURANT FINANCE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 03/18/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY ADVANCE RESTAURANT FINANCE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 03/18/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • LEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.