This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/15/2023 at 04:38:11 (UTC).

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY VS. XL INSURANCE AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2023 ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against XL INSURANCE AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zurich American Insurance Company

Defendant

XL Insurance America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORALES, FIERRO & REEVES

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/22/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/22/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/22/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/22/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13199465 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13027572.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13199465 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13027572.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/29/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/29/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/27/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/27/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOFFER; Department: C16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31288284 RECEIVED ON 03/27/2023 03:19:43 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/29/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13199465 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13027572.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31286244 RECEIVED ON 03/22/2023 03:33:29 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 03/22/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less